EP1077696 - FURAN NITRONE THERAPEUTICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTAUR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 484 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2001/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLITTER, William, D. 950 High School Way 3230 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 02 /
GARLAND, William, A. 250 Baldwin Street 901 San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | 03 /
GREENWOOD-VAN MEERVELD, Beverly 6224 Kingsbridge Drive Oklahoma City, OK 73162 / US | 04 /
IRWIN, Ian 800 Cowper Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99922985.9 | 18.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US10444 | Priority number, date | US19980085974P | 19.05.1998 Original published format: US 85974 P | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959579 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1077696 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/34 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/351 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | FURAN-NITRONE THERAPEUTISCHE MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN DARMERKRANKUNGEN | [2001/09] | English: | FURAN NITRONE THERAPEUTICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE | [2001/09] | French: | MEDICAMENT A BASE DE NITRONE FURANIQUE, DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT DES AFFECTIONS INFLAMMATOIRES DE L'INTESTIN | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 01.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/23] | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXY]WO9803496 (CENTAUR PHARMACEUTICALS INC ;KELLEHER JUDITH A (US); MAPLES KIRK R) [PX] 1-5,23 * page 2, line 7 * * examples 3-6,8 * * claim - * [PY] 1-23; | [Y]WO9222290 (OKLAHOMA MED RES FOUND ;UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND (US)) [Y] 1-23 * page 8, line 1 - page 12, line L * * See N-oxide compounds disclosed in pages 15-18 * * page 28, lines 6-34 * * claims 1,6,7,11,17,18 *; | [Y]US5036097 (FLOYD ROBERT A ET AL) [Y] 1-23 * column 3, lines 35-38 *; | [A]GB1105007 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO.) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9511227 (OKLAHOMA MED RES FOUND) [A] 1-23 * examples 4-6 *; | [A]WO9517876 (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND ;CARNEY JOHN M (US); OKLAHOMA MED RES FOUN) [A] 1-23 * claims 1-4 * | [A] - KIM, H. K. ET AL, "Nitrones. I..alpha.-(5-Nitro-2- furyl )-N- arylnitrones", J. MED. CHEM. (1969), 12, 719-20, XP002111029 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00304a049 | [A] - BONNER G F, "CURRENT MEDICAL THERAPY FOR INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE", SOUTHERN MEDICAL JOURNAL, (19960601), vol. 89, no. 6, ISSN 0038-4348, pages 556 - 566, XP000673623 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | [A] - ANANA, RAYMOND D. ET AL, "Synthesis and smooth -muscle calcium-channel effects of dialkyl 1,4-dihydro-2,6-dimethyl-4-aryl-3,5-pyridinedicarboxylates containing a nitrone moiety in the 4-aryl substituent", ARCH. PHARM. (WEINHEIM, GER.) (1997), 330(3), 53-58, XP002111030 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |