Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3992099 | Global Dossier | 06.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US8003398 | 15.05.1998 | US9910682 | 14.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1078448 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8003398 | 15.05.1998 | US9910682 | 14.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2330672 | 25.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8003398 | 15.05.1998 | US9910682 | 14.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9960695 | Global Dossier | 25.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8003398 | 15.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6054819 | 25.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US8003398 | 15.05.1998 |