EP1078448 - DRIVING CIRCUIT FOR SWITCHED RELUCTANCE MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baldor Electric Company 5711 R.S. Boreham Jr. Street Fort Smith, AR 72908 / US | [2002/04] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Tridelta Industries, Inc. 7333 Corporate Boulevard Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENGOV, Wayne, A. 13405 Chardon Windsor Road Chardon, OH 44024 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99923066.7 | 14.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US10682 | Priority number, date | US19980080033 | 15.05.1998 Original published format: US 80033 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960695 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078448 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/05 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H02P25/092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | ANSTEUERSCHALTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCH KOMMUTIERTE RELUKTANZMASCHINEN | [2001/09] | English: | DRIVING CIRCUIT FOR SWITCHED RELUCTANCE MACHINES | [2001/09] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE POUR MACHINES A RELUCTANCE COMMUTEE | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4684867 (MILLER TIMOTHY J E [US], et al) [A] 1,7,11,12,19,24,30,31 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 58; figures 3-6 *; | [A]WO8901260 (UNIV DUNDEE [GB]) [A] 1,7,11,12,19,24,30,31 * abstract * * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5084662 (PALANIAPPAN RASAPPA [US], et al) [DA] 1,32 * column A ** column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 9; figures 4A,4B,5A-F *; | [DA]US5115181 (SOOD PRADEEP K [US]) [DA] 1 * column A * * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 11; figures 1A,1B,2,3,6A,6B *; | [A]EP0599334 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,11,12,19,24,30,31 * abstract * * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 20; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US5703456 (COX KARMEN D [US]) [A] 1,7,11,12,19,24,30,31 * column 7, line 13 - column 10, line 64; figures 4A,4B * |