EP1078499 - DETERMINATION OF DISTANCE BETWEEN NODES IN A COMPUTER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HURST, Stephen, A. 8 Dora Street Nashua, NH 03060 / US | 02 /
CHIU, Dah, Ming 736 Main Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | 03 /
HANNA, Stephen, R. 3 Beverly Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 04 /
PERLMAN, Radia, J. 10 Huckleberry Lane Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99923085.7 | 14.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US10721 | Priority number, date | US19980079504 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: US 79504 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959304 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078499 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H04L45/26 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/16 (EP,US);
H04L45/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VOM ABSTAND ZWISCHEN KNOTEN EINES COMPUTERNETZES | [2001/09] | English: | DETERMINATION OF DISTANCE BETWEEN NODES IN A COMPUTER NETWORK | [2001/09] | French: | DETERMINATION DE LA DISTANCE ENTRE LES NOEUDS DANS UN RESEAU INFORMATIQUE | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5675741 (AGGARWAL AJAY [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract ** column 2, line 35 - line 47 *; | [A] - DUBE R ET AL, "SIGNAL STABILITY-BASED ADAPTIVE ROUTING (SSA) FOR AD HOC MOBILE NETWORKS", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, (19970201), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 36 - 45, XP000679252 [A] 1,6,10,15,19,24 * page 36, column R - page 38, column R * * page 39, column L; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.575990 |