EP1000268 - CLUTCH HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EMBRAYAGES s.a.s. 5, Avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR | [2003/44] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen 75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REY, Frédéric 51, rue de la Roquette F-75011 Paris / FR | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Lemaire, Marc VALEO TRANSMISSIONS, Service Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15, rue des Rosiers 93585 Saint Ouen Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Lemaire, Marc VALEO TRANSMISSIONS, Service Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15, rue des Rosiers 93585 Saint Ouen Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99923699.5 | 08.06.1999 | [2000/20] | WO1999FR01355 | Priority number, date | FR19980007213 | 09.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807213 | FR19990002429 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9902429 | [2000/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9964758 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000268 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/08, F15B7/08, B60T11/16 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
F16D25/088 (EP,KR,US);
B60T11/16 (EP,US);
F15B7/08 (EP,US);
F16D25/08 (EP);
F16D2025/081 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT [2000/20] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINER KUPPLUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2000/20] | English: | CLUTCH HYDRAULIC CONTROL DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR CAR | [2000/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE D'UN EMBRAYAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 18.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 02.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3713248 (BOGE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8911600 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-5* figure 3 *; | [A]DE4000835 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,12 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 26; figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE19700025 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19620580 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1,11,21 * figure 1; claims 6-9 * | by applicant | GB1539879 | DE29516488U | FR19990002426 |