EP1080586 - SERVICE PROVISION SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIS, Martin John 16 The Birches, Marlborough Road Swindon SN3 1PT / GB | 02 /
FARR, Jeffrey, Roger 35 Salehurst Road Ipswich IP3 8RY / GB | 03 /
JAMES-BELL, Duncan Charles 8 Southay Close, St. Andrews Ridge Swindon SN2 2WF / GB | 04 /
WARREN, Nigel 5 Meryman Drive, Crowthorne Reading RG45 6TW / GB | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street, London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99923765.4 | 26.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999GB01661 | Priority number, date | GB19980011267 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: GB 9811267 | EP19980304144 | 26.05.1998 Original published format: EP 98304144 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962272 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080586 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080586 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04M15/00, H04L12/14 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
H04Q3/00 (KR);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR UNTERSTÜZTUNG DER BEREITSTELLUNG VON DIENSTEN | [2003/50] | English: | SERVICE PROVISION SUPPORT SYSTEM | [2001/10] | French: | SYSTEME D'ASSISTANCE AUX PRESTATIONS DE SERVICE | [2001/10] |
Former [2001/10] | SYSTEM ZUR UNTERSTÜZTUNG VON DIENSTBEREITSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03078213.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 14.11.2003 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Request for further processing for: | 12.03.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.05.2004 | CH | 19.05.2004 | IT | 19.05.2004 | LI | 19.05.2004 | NL | 19.05.2004 | IE | 26.05.2004 | SE | 19.08.2004 | ES | 30.08.2004 | PT | 19.10.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/13] | BE | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
NL | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | BE | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | BE | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X] - PAVON J ET AL., "The VITAL Network Resource Architecture", PROCEEDINGS TINA'97 - GLOBAL CONVERGENCE OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND DISTRIBUTED OBJECT COMPUTING, SANTIAGO (CL), (19971117), pages 130 - 138, XP002082940 [X] 1-14,18,19 * figures 4,5 * * page 132, column L, line 26 - column R, line 13 * * page 135 * * page 138, column L, line 9 - line 35 * | [A] - HELLEMANS P ET AL., "TINA Service Architecture: From Specification to Implementation", PROCEEDINGS TINA'97 - GLOBAL CONVERGENCE OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND DISTRIBUTED OBJECT COMPUTING, SANTIAGO (CL), (19971117), pages 174 - 183, XP002082032 [A] 4,13,18,19 * page 178 - page 182 * | [A] - ABARCA C ET AL, Network Resource Architecture (Version 3.0), HTTP://WWW.TINAC.COM, TELECOMMUNICATIONS INFORMATION NETWORKING ARCHITECTURE CONSORTIUM, (19970210), XP002082942 [A] 1-19 * pages 7-137 - pages 7-180 * | [A] - ABARCA C ET AL, Service Architecture (Version 5.0), HTTP://WWW.TINAC.COM, TELECOMMUNICATIONS INFORMATION NETWORKING ARCHITECTURE CONSORTIUM, (19970616), XP002082943 [A] 1-19 * page 61 - page 74 * | [A] - DE ZEN G ET AL., "Value-added Internet: a pragmatic TINA-based path to the Internet and PSTN Integration", PROCEEDINGS TINA '97 - GLOBAL CONVERGENCE OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND DISTRIBUTED OBJECT COMPUTING, SANTIAGO (CL), (19971117), pages 13 - 21, XP002082941 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |