|
14.06.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2007 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
102 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2000 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2000 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.06.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.06.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
12.06.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
35 |
|
12.06.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
12.06.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |