EP1047792 - A METHOD FOR DEPOPULATING OF VERTEBRATE TESTIS AND FOR GENERATION OF TRANSGENIC SPECIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | For all designated states IMPERIAL COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LIMITED Sherfield Building, Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90048-1869 / US | ||
For all designated states IMPERIAL COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LIMITED Sherfield Building, Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | |||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90048-1869 / US | ||
For all designated states IMPERIAL COLLEGE OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY & MEDICINE Exhibition Road, South Kensington London SW7 2AZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
READHEAD, Carol, W. 2185 San Pasqual Street Pasadena, CA 91107 / US | 02 /
WINSTON, Robert 11 Denman Drive London NW11 6RE / GB | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Stephen, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Miles, John Stephen, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | Ritthaler, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat.Dipl.-Chem., et al Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 99924219.1 | 13.05.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999US10573 | Priority number, date | WO1998US24238 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: PCT/US98/24238 | US19980191920 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: US 191920 | WO1999US08277 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: PCT/US99/08277 | US19990292723 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: US 292723 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029601 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047792 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/89, C12N15/86, C12N15/88, C12N5/06, A01K67/027, A61K48/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP);
A01K67/027 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C12N5/061 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
A61K35/12 (EP);
C12N2510/00 (EP);
C12N2510/02 (EP);
C12N2799/021 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTVÖLKERUNG VON VERTEBRATE-TESTIS UND ZUR GENERIERUNG VON TRANSGENEN TIERARTEN | [2000/44] | English: | A METHOD FOR DEPOPULATING OF VERTEBRATE TESTIS AND FOR GENERATION OF TRANSGENIC SPECIES | [2000/44] | French: | TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT DE DEPEUPLER UN TESTICULE DE VERTEBRE ET DE GENERER UNE ESPECE TRANSGENIQUE | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/42] | Request for further processing for: | 21.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.01.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2001 | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.10.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9311228 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [Y] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * the whole document * [A] 6-10,17-47,50,71-85,89,105-107; | [A]EP0867114 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL LTD [JP], et al) [A] 88,91,92,94,124,130,143-155 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH09220039 ; | [A]WO9008192 (CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 47-53,59,62,66,71-83,79-84,90,93,97-109 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9502041 (JOLLA CANCER RES FOUND [US]) [X] 47-53,59,62,66,71-83 * page 15, line 4 - page 18, line 35 *; | [A]WO9203459 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) [A] 16,57,58,95,96,126,127 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 12 * * page 27, line 21 - line 28 * | [Y] - VAN ALPHEN MM ET AL., "Repopulation of the seminiferous epithelium of the rhesus monkey after X irradiation", RADIATION RESEARCH, amsterdam nl, (198803), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 487 - 500, XP002117132 [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 44, Database accession no. 97-474265, XP002099974 & JPH09220039 A 19970826 (KOIKE C) [A] 124,130,136-155 * abstract * | [A] - KIM JH ET AL, "Development of a positive method for male stem cell-mediated gene transfer in mouse and pig", MOLECULAR REPRODUCTION AND DEVELOPENT, US, (199704), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 515 - 526, XP002099971 [A] 1-3,88,91,124,130,134 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-2795(199704)46:4<515::AID-MRD10>3.0.CO;2-V | [A] - MURAMATSU T ET AL, "Foreign gene expression in the mouse testis by localized in vivo gene transfer", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS., ORLANDO, FL US, (19970407), vol. 233, no. 1, pages 45 - 49, XP002099972 [A] 88,91,95-101,124 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1997.6361 | [A] - BLANCHARD KT ET AL., "Adenovirus-mediated gene transfer to rat testis in vivo", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, US, (199702), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 495 - 500, XP002099973 [A] 88,91-93,101,124,130,135,136,138-141 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod56.2.495 |