EP1078495 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONIZING FAST ETHERNET DATA PACKETS TO RADIO FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WINNET MCS, INC. 635 Vaqueros Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Winnet Mcs, Inc. 635 Vaqueros Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREADAWAY, Kirk 900 Wallace Avenue Aptos, CA 95003 / US | 02 /
LE NGOC, Tho 8221 Due Mail Anjou, Quebec H1K 1Z5 / CA | 03 /
DENTON, Darryl 999-9 Delmont Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
HAMILTON, Mike 1831 Van Buren Circle Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2001/21] |
Former [2001/09] | 01 /
TREADAWAY, Kirk 900 Wallace Avenue Aptos, CA 95003 / US | ||
02 /
LE NGOC, Tho 8221 Due Mail Anjou, Quebec H1K 1Z5 / CA | |||
03 /
DENTON, Darryl 949 Belmont Terrace 9 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
04 /
HAMILTON, Mike 1831 Van Buren Circle Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | Representative(s) | Bluff, John William, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Bluff, John William, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99924377.7 | 20.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US11125 | Priority number, date | US19980086459P | 22.05.1998 Original published format: US 86459 P | US19980159267 | 23.09.1998 Original published format: US 159267 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962226 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078495 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L1/00, H04L12/413, H04L25/02 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H04L1/0015 (EP);
H04L1/0003 (EP);
H04L12/413 (EP);
H04L25/05 (EP);
H04L47/13 (EP);
H04W28/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SYNCHRONISIERUNG VON SCHNELL-ETHERNET-DATENPAKETEN IN RADIOÜBERTRAGENEN RAHMEN | [2001/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONIZING FAST ETHERNET DATA PACKETS TO RADIO FRAMES | [2001/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SYNCHRONISATION DE PAQUETS DE DONNEES ETHERNET RAPIDE ET DE TRAMES RADIO | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 26.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5436902 (MCNAMARA ROBERT P [US], et al); | [A]US5636213 (EASTMOND BRUCE C [US], et al); | [A]GB2316583 (MOTOROLA ISRAEL LTD [IL]); |