20.07.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
11.08.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] |
02.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.05.2006 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
07.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.03.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
28.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.03.2001 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
23.02.2001 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
16.02.2001 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] |
09.02.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
09.02.2001 |
Change - inventor |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
26.01.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
26.01.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
28.12.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
22.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|