Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03095457 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0015231 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2000 | A9 | WO0015231 | 15.06.2000 | A8 | WO0015231 | 23.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8161969 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2012 | B2 | US2008230058 | 25.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32763302 | 19.12.2002 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | US87394601 | 04.06.2001 | US7787708 | 21.03.2008 | US7641805 | 09.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7470698 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2008 | B2 | US2007249641 | 25.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US77478407 | 09.07.2007 | US16931105 | 27.06.2005 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7422013 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2008 | B2 | US2006048780 | 09.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32763302 | 19.12.2002 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | US87394601 | 04.06.2001 | US7641805 | 09.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7271171 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2007 | B2 | US2006040959 | 23.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US16931105 | 27.06.2005 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100448555B | Global Dossier | 13.09.2004 | B1 | KR20010089154 | 29.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006510574 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0214191 | 06.05.2002 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4044734B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2008 | B2 | JP2003527136 | 16.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002524519 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1685866 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | A3 | EP1685866 | 02.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | EP99924396 | 19.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1499614 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2005 | A4 | EP1499614 | 26.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0214191 | 06.05.2002 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU749211B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2002 | B2 | AU6248299 | 03.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU775629B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2004 | B2 | AU4090599 | 20.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002305386 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0214191 | 06.05.2002 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1082155 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2006 | B1 | EP1082155 | 14.03.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP1443 | 30.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT414240B | 15.10.2006 | B | ATA904399 | 15.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT503591 | 15.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0210720 | 20.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0214191 | 06.05.2002 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9910931 | 16.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9913766 | 05.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2332007 | 07.08.2007 | C | CA2332007 | 23.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2332853 | 18.03.2008 | C | CA2332853 | 09.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2451081 | 20.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0214191 | 06.05.2002 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH692132 | 28.02.2002 | A5 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1154494C | 23.06.2004 | C | CN1303289 | 11.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1105808T | 02.02.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19983530T | 08.11.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69933210T | 13.09.2007 | T2 | DE69933210D1 | 26.10.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1082155T | 29.01.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK200100432 | 14.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA002869 | 31.10.2002 | B1 | EA200100007 | 25.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE04706 | 16.10.2006 | B1 | EE200000721 | 15.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG22154 | 30.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2204262 | 01.03.2005 | B1 | ES2204262 | 16.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI116624B | 13.01.2006 | B | FI20002367 | 19.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2353527 | 25.02.2004 | B | GB2353527 | 28.02.2001 | A | GB0027879D0 | 27.12.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GT199900121 | 11.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1031696 | 22.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1035671 | 07.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20010008 | 31.12.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0102589 | 28.01.2002 | A3 | HUP0102589 | 28.11.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0103610 | 28.01.2003 | A3 | HUP0103610 | 28.02.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID28100A | 03.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL139791 | 31.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL156851 | 20.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS5706 | 07.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS5734 | 24.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LU90687 | 19.12.2000 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA03011958 | 06.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0214191 | 06.05.2002 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO318078B | 31.01.2005 | B1 | NO20005508L | 15.03.2001 | L | NO20005508D0 | 01.11.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20006167L | 05.02.2001 | L | NO20006167D0 | 04.12.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ508536 | 28.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ509149 | 29.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL196080B | 31.12.2007 | B1 | PL345179 | 03.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL344600 | 05.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO121030 | 30.11.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2250904 | 27.04.2005 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE522578 | 17.02.2004 | C2 | SE0003984L | 22.12.2000 | L | SE0003984D0 | 01.11.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9921103 | 15.09.1999 | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1082155T | 28.02.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | EP99924396 | 19.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK285882B | 04.10.2007 | B6 | SK18162000 | 02.07.2002 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200003461T | 21.06.2001 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA68382 | 16.08.2004 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US9911180 | 19.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6546929 | 15.04.2003 | B2 | US2002017297 | 14.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | US87394601 | 04.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6921825 | 26.07.2005 | B2 | US2003144266 | 31.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6901929 | 07.06.2005 | B2 | US2003209243 | 13.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32763302 | 19.12.2002 | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | US87394601 | 04.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6407236 | 18.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6448253 | 10.09.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | YU83600 | 31.12.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US37930099 | 23.08.1999 | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200006920 | 25.02.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200101626 | 13.12.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | US15443598 | 16.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200309907 | 22.03.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | US13421902 | 26.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9962495 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2000 | A3 | WO9962495 | 09.12.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100608118B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2006 | B1 | KR20010071400 | 28.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4386936B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2009 | B2 | JP2008068114 | 27.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR018443 | 14.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE339232T | 15.10.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG65349B | 31.03.2008 | B1 | BG105113 | 28.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1217711C | 07.09.2005 | C | CN1312729 | 12.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO5021133 | 27.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DZ2810 | 01.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2273490T | 01.05.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID29131A | 02.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA24907 | 01.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY135967 | 31.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | OA11692 | 12.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PA8474901 | 29.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20000626 | 22.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1082155E | 31.01.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS49669 | 21.09.2007 | B | YU76300 | 18.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA99200468 | 06.05.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200003611T | 21.06.2001 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW509069U | 01.11.2002 | U | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6257233 | 10.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY25537 | 13.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31243499 | 14.05.1999 | US8792998 | 04.06.1998 | Type | Divisional application | EP1685866 |