EP1082155 - DRY POWDER DISPERSING APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nektar Therapeutics 150 Industrial Road San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [2003/20] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Inhale Therapeutic Systems, Inc. 150 Industrial Road San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Inhale Therapeutic Systems 150 Industrial Road San Carlos, California 94070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURR, John, D. 1135 Cedarwood Way Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Adrian, E. 2803 Alhambra Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 03 /
HALL, Randy, K. 107 Lotus Circle Carson City, Nevada 89703 / US | 04 /
SNYDER, Herm 627 Big Bend Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 05 /
SCHULER, Carlos 10344 Denison Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
AXFORD, George, S. 447 Norfolk Drive Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 07 /
RAY, Charles 5310 Paso del Rio Way Concord, CA 94521 / US | [2001/18] |
Former [2001/15] | 01 /
BURR, John, D. 1135 Cedarwood Way Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, Adrian, E. 2803 Alhambra Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
03 /
HALL, Randy, K. 717 Sylvan Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
04 /
SNYDER, Herm 627 Big Bend Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | |||
05 /
SCHULER, Carlos 10344 Denison Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
AXFORD, George, S. 447 Norfolk Drive Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | |||
07 /
RAY, Charles 5310 Paso del Rio Way Concord, CA 94521 / US | |||
Former [2001/14] | 01 /
BURR, John, D. 1135 Cedarwood Way Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, Adrian, E. 2803 Alhambra Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
03 /
HALL, Randy, K. 717 Sylvan Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
04 /
SNYDER, Herm 627 Big Bend Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | |||
05 /
SCHULER, Carlos 10344 Denison Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
AXFORD, George, S. 447 Norfolk Drive Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | |||
07 /
RAY, Charles 582 Cutwater Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
Former [2001/13] | 01 /
BURR, John, D. 1135 Cedarwood Way Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, Adrian, E. 2803 Alhambra Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
03 /
HALL, Randy, K. 717 Sylvan Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
04 /
SNYDER, Herm 627 Big Bend Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | |||
05 /
SCHULER, Carlos 10344 Denison Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
AXFORD, George, S. 2727 Edison Street 116 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
07 /
RAY, Charles 582 Cutwater Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
Former [2001/11] | 01 /
BURR, John, D. 1135 Cedarwood Way Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, Adrian, E. 2803 Alhambra Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
03 /
HALL, Randy, K. 717 Sylvan Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
04 /
SNYDER, Herm 501 Daleview Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
05 /
SCHULER, Carlos 10344 Denison Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
AXFORD, George, S. 2727 Edison Street 116 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
07 /
RAY, Charles 582 Cutwater Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridge PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99924396.7 | 19.05.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999US11180 | Priority number, date | US19980087929P | 04.06.1998 Original published format: US 87929 P | US19990312434 | 14.05.1999 Original published format: US 312434 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9962495 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1082155 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1082155 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M11/02 (KR);
A61M15/0036 (EP,US);
B05B11/062 (EP,US);
A61M15/0086 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Extension states | AL | 15.12.2000 | LT | 15.12.2000 | LV | 15.12.2000 | MK | 15.12.2000 | RO | 15.12.2000 | SI | 15.12.2000 | Title | German: | ABGABEVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR TROCKENPULVER SOWIE DEREN ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2001/11] | English: | DRY POWDER DISPERSING APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE | [2001/11] | French: | APPAREILS DE DISPERSION DE POUDRE SECHE ET LEURS METHODES D'UTILISATION | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06076024.6 / EP1685866 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US3918451 (STEIL EMERAM) [X] 10 * figures 2-4; claims 1,3,4 * [A] 4 [Y] 1; | [A]US5366122 (GUENTERT BERNHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,10,23* column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 2 *; | [XDAY]US5740794 (SMITH ADRIAN E [US], et al) [XD] 23 * column 22, line 22 - line 28 * * column 23, line 9 - line 12 * [A] 4 [Y] 1 | by applicant | US5740794 |