28.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
19.01.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
28.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
02.05.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] |
04.04.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] |
21.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
07.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
21.02.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
15.11.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
30.08.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
23.08.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] |
02.03.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
19.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.08.2001 |
First examination report |
|
06.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.01.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
12.01.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
22.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|