EP1078208 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GmbH Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6 65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Messer Griesheim GmbH Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6 65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Frankfurt Airport Center 1, C9, Hugo-Eckener-Ring 60547 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXEEV, Alexander Malterstrasse 36 D-01159 Dresden / DE | 02 /
QUACK, Hans Rugestrasse 4 D-01069 Dresden / DE | [2001/09] | Application number, filing date | 99924849.5 | 30.04.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999EP02932 | Priority number, date | DE1998120961 | 12.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19820961 | DE1998121308 | 13.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821308 | [2001/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958905 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078208 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078208 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/02, F25B43/02 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
F25B40/02 (EP,US);
F25B43/02 (EP,US);
F25B7/00 (EP,US);
F25B9/02 (EP,US);
F25B31/004 (EP,US);
F25B43/003 (EP,US);
F25B9/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KÄLTEERZEUGUNG | [2001/09] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COLD | [2001/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DU FROID | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 14.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.04.2002 | GB | 17.04.2002 | GR | 17.04.2002 | IE | 17.04.2002 | IT | 17.04.2002 | CY | 30.04.2002 | LU | 30.04.2002 | MC | 30.04.2002 | DK | 17.07.2002 | PT | 17.07.2002 | SE | 17.07.2002 | ES | 28.07.2002 | [2008/18] |
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.04.2002 | |
GB | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CY | 30.04.2002 | ||
LU | 30.04.2002 | ||
MC | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
ES | 28.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CY | 30.04.2002 | ||
LU | 30.04.2002 | ||
MC | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
ES | 28.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CY | 30.04.2002 | ||
MC | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
ES | 28.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
MC | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
ES | 28.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
MC | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
MC | 30.04.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
IE | 17.04.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 17.04.2002 | |
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 17.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01244251 ; | [A]WO8403139 (GEN PNEUMATICS CORP [US]); | [A]US5441658 (BOYARSKY MIKHAIL [RU], et al) [A] 1,4-6,8-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 6, line 34 *; | [A]WO9703329 (APD CRYOGENICS INC [US]) [A] 1,6,7,10,12 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 1 *; | [PXA]DE19648902 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [PX] 1,3,6,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - line 26 * * column 1, line 58 - line 66 * * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 32 * [PA] 8,10,12,13,16; | [E]DE19747985 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [E] 1,3,6,7,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 21 *; | [A] - ALEXEEV A ET AL, "Weiterentwicklung eines Gemisch-Joule-Thomson-Kryokühlers", DKV-TAGUNGSBERICHT, Leipzig, (19961120), URL: http://www.tu-dresden.de/mw/iem/kkt/mitarbeiter/lib/Alex/dkv_artikel7.html, (19990902), XP002114431 [A] 1,4-6,8,10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891221), vol. 013, no. 582, Database accession no. (M - 911), & JP01244251 A 19890928 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | - H. JUNGNICKEL, R. AGSTEN, W.E. KRAUS, GRUNDLAGEN DER KÄLTETECHNIK, VERLAG TECHNICK GMBH, (1990), page 309 |