28.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
12.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
28.03.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
07.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
17.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
22.11.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
05.04.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
19.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.10.2001 |
First examination report |
|
23.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
09.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
07.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|