EP1086438 - UNIVERSAL CHIP CARD READING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEOFFROY, Philippe 4, rue Yves Farge F-38600 Fontaine / FR | 02 /
BALESTRO, Freddy 8, chemin de la Bastille F-38700 La Tronche / FR | 03 /
BOUVIER, Jacky 23, rue Champ Noyaret F-38240 Meylan / FR | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/13] | Des Termes, Monique, et al c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99925123.4 | 17.06.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999FR01458 | Priority number, date | FR19980007757 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807757 | [2001/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966447 | Date: | 23.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086438 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086438 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/08 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
G06K7/0004 (EP);
G06K19/07 (EP);
G06K7/0008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [2001/13] | Title | German: | LESESYSTEM FÜR UNIVERSALCHIPKARTEN | [2001/13] | English: | UNIVERSAL CHIP CARD READING SYSTEM | [2001/13] | French: | SYSTEME DE LECTURE DE CARTES A PUCE UNIVERSEL | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.05.2002 | IT | 22.05.2002 | NL | 22.05.2002 | DE | 23.08.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2008/18] |
Former [2004/05] | GB | 22.05.2002 | |
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GB | 22.05.2002 | |
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
DE | 23.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 22.05.2002 | |
NL | 22.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 22.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5451763 (PICKETT DAVID R ET AL) [Y] 1,3-6 * abstract * * column 5, lines 1-33 *; | [Y]EP0769765 (SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH) [Y] 1,3-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2622330 (SAMOKINE GEORGES) [A] 3 * figure 3 * |