22.10.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
30.07.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.07.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.04.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
19.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
15.07.2005 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
07.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.12.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.01.2002 [2002/04] |
28.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.05.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] |
04.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] |
05.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|