EP1115168 - CELL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Yasuhiro 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
HIROI, Osamu 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
HAMANO, Kouji 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
TAKEMURA, Daigo 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
AIHARA, Sigeru 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 06 /
SHIOTA, Hisashi 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 07 /
ARAGANE, Jun 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 08 /
URUSHIBATA, Hiroaki 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 09 /
MURAI, Michio 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 10 /
INUZUKA, Takayuki 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99925415.4 | 22.06.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999JP03320 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079624 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115168 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/22, H01M10/40 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
H01M6/22 (EP,US);
H01M10/056 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M10/058 (KR);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M50/392 (EP,US);
H01M6/168 (EP,US);
H01M2200/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2001/28] | Title | German: | ZELLE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/28] | English: | CELL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2001/28] | French: | CELLULE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2001 | Translation filed | 20.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 08.04.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH01112667 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO, et al); | [Y]JPH05182650 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09270271 (OZAWA AKINOBU); | [Y]JPS63245866 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPS60182666 (TOSHIBA BATTERY) |