EP1013112 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING POWER CONTROL BIT PATTERN ACCORDING TO TRANSMIT ANTENNA IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-ku Suwon-shi Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-shi Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-shi, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Yu, Suk 954-21, Taech-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-281 / KR | 02 /
AHN, Jae, Min Puleun Samho Apt. 109-303, Irwonpon-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-239 / KR | 03 /
YOON, Soon, Young Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. Samsung Plaza 463-050 Pundang P.O. Box 32 / KR | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/26] | 01 /
YUN, Yu, Suk 954-21, Taech-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-281 / KR | ||
02 /
AHN, Jae, Min Puleun Samho Apt. 109-303, Irwonpon-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-239 / KR | |||
03 /
YOON, Soon, Young 165, Karak-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-169 / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99925443.6 | 12.06.1999 | [2000/26] | WO1999KR00292 | Priority number, date | KR19980022638 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: KR 9822638 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9965257 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013112 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013112 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20, H04B7/005 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H04W52/42 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/04 (KR);
H04B7/0602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON LEISTUNGSREGELUNG-BITMUSTER ZU SENDEANTENNEN IN EINEM MOBILEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/26] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING POWER CONTROL BIT PATTERN ACCORDING TO TRANSMIT ANTENNA IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2000/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT L'ECHANGE DE SEQUENCES BINAIRES POUR LE CONTROLE DE PUISSANCE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE EN FONCTION DE L'ANTENNE D'EMISSION | [2005/38] |
Former [2000/26] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT L'ECHANGE DE STRUCTURES BINAIRES DE GESTION DE PUISSANCE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE EN FONCTION DE L'ANTENNE D'EMISSION | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 15.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5737327 (LING FUYUN [US], et al); | [A]US5649287 (FORSSEN ULF GOERAN [SE], et al) |