EP1137624 - METHOD OF PREPARATION OF 4-AMINODIPHENYLAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUSLO, a.s. SK-92703 Sala / SK | [2001/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSKA, Emanuel Demänovská 25 831 06 Bratislava / SK | 02 /
TOMAN, Peter Kadnárova 8 831 05 Bratislava / SK | 03 /
FIEDLER, Karol; Jánošikova 731 900 42 Dunajská Lužná / SK | 04 /
HRONEC, Milan; Martincekova 30 821 01 Bratislava / SK | 05 /
PINTER, Jozef; Pod Zlatym brehom 48 949 01 Nitra / SK | [2004/01] |
Former [2001/40] | 01 /
BESSKA, Emanuel Demänovská 25 831 06 Bratislava / SK | ||
02 /
TOMAN, Peter Kadnárova 8 831 05 Bratislava / SK | |||
03 /
FIEDLER, Karol; Jánošikova 731 900 42 Dunajská Lužná / SK | |||
04 /
HRONEC, Milan; Martinčekova 30 821 01 Bratislava / SK | |||
05 /
PINTER, Jozef; Pod Zlatým brehom 48 949 01 Nitra / SK | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2001/40] | Jeck, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 99925539.1 | 29.04.1999 | [2001/40] | WO1999SK00010 | Priority number, date | SK19980001714 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: SK 171498 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0035853 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1137624 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1137624 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/36, C07C209/38, C07C209/02 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
C07C209/38 (EP,US);
C07C209/36 (EP,KR,US);
C07C209/68 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/36, C07C211/55 (EP,US);
C07C209/36, C07C211/56 (US,EP);
C07C209/38, C07C211/55 (US,EP);
C07C209/38, C07C211/56 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 4-AMINODIPHENYLAMIN | [2001/40] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARATION OF 4-AMINODIPHENYLAMINE | [2001/40] | French: | PROCEDE RELATIF A L'ELABORATION DE 4-AMINODIPHENYLAMINE | [2001/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 18.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2004 | CH | 02.01.2004 | CY | 02.01.2004 | FI | 02.01.2004 | LI | 02.01.2004 | DK | 02.04.2004 | GR | 02.04.2004 | SE | 02.04.2004 | IE | 29.04.2004 | LU | 29.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | PT | 02.06.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.01.2004 | |
CH | 02.01.2004 | ||
CY | 02.01.2004 | ||
FI | 02.01.2004 | ||
LI | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
IE | 29.04.2004 | ||
LU | 29.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 02.01.2004 | |
CH | 02.01.2004 | ||
FI | 02.01.2004 | ||
LI | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
IE | 29.04.2004 | ||
LU | 29.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 02.01.2004 | |
CH | 02.01.2004 | ||
FI | 02.01.2004 | ||
LI | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
LU | 29.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.01.2004 | |
CH | 02.01.2004 | ||
FI | 02.01.2004 | ||
LI | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 02.01.2004 | |
CH | 02.01.2004 | ||
FI | 02.01.2004 | ||
LI | 02.01.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 02.01.2004 | |
FI | 02.01.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
SE | 02.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB713622 (DU PONT) [A] 1 * examples 1,7; claims 1,8 *; | [AD]US5117063 (STERN MICHAEL K [US], et al) [AD] 1 * example 1; claims 1,17 *; | [A]US5252737 (STERN MICHAEL K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 1-23; examples 1-3; claims 1,19 *; | [A]EP0784049 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * examples 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [AD] - YURI GOLDBERG ET AL., "betaines derived from amino and hydrazino acids as phase transfer catalysts", TETRAHEDRON, OXFORD GB, (1990), vol. 46, no. 6, pages 1911 - 1922, XP002113890 [AD] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)89759-3 | [A] - VELICHKO, L. I., "Interphase catalysis in the reactions of electrophylic substitution.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930510), vol. 118, no. 19, Database accession no. 191059p, page 886, column 2, XP002113891 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - UKR. KHIM. ZH., (1992), vol. 58, no. 9, pages 798 - 801 |