EP1079820 - BENZAMIDE THERAPEUTICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renovis, Inc. 2 Corporate Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2004/21] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Renovis, Inc. 270 Littlefield Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states CENTAUR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 484 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLITTER, William, D. 950 High School Way 3230 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 02 /
GARLAND, William, A. 203 Tait Avenue Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 03 /
IRWIN, Ian 800 Cowper Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99925593.8 | 18.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US10445 | Priority number, date | US19980086361P | 19.05.1998 Original published format: US 86361 P | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959569 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079820 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Extension states | AL | 22.11.2000 | LT | 22.11.2000 | LV | 22.11.2000 | MK | 22.11.2000 | RO | 22.11.2000 | SI | 22.11.2000 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL AUF DER BASIS VON BENZAMIDEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN DARMERKRANKUNGEN | [2001/10] | English: | BENZAMIDE THERAPEUTICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE | [2001/10] | French: | MEDICAMENT A BASE DE BENZAMIDE, DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT DES AFFECTIONS INFLAMMATOIRES DE L'INTESTIN | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9700680 (LOGEAIS LABOR JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6-11,14-27 *see in particular claim 1, pges 8-11 *; | [X]EP0474403 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1,6-11,14-27 * see in particular claim 1; page 7,line 25 - page 8, line 27 *; | [X]WO9730990 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL INC [US]) [X] 1,6-11,14-27 * see claim 1; page 1, lines 15-26 *; | [XY]WO9631462 (CENTAUR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 *see in particular the claims 1-24; pages 11-13* *see example 2* [Y] 1-27; | [DXY]WO9528153 (CENTAUR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [DX] 1-5 *see in particular the claims 1-4;Table 1 (pages 4-5)* [Y] 1-27; | [XY] - GREENWOOD-VAN MEERVELD, B. (1) ET AL, "Anti-inflammatory effects of a novel antioxidant in rats.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (APRIL 15, 1998) VOL. 114, NO. 4 PART 2, PP. A987. MEETING INFO.: DIGESTIVE DISEASES WEEK AND THE 99TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN GASTROENTEROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA MAY 16-22, 1998 AMERICAN ASSOCIATION F, XP002117692 [X] 1-7,9,10,12-14,16,21,26 *see the abstract G4047 * [Y] 1-27 | [PX] - GREENWOOD-VAN MAERVELD, BEVERLEY (1) ET AL, "CPI - 1189 protects against dextran sulfate sodium-induced colitis in mice.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (APRIL, 1999) VOL. 116, NO. 4 PART 2, PP. A727. MEETING INFO.: DIGESTIVE DISEASE WEEK AND THE 100TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN GASTROENTEROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA MAY 16-19, 1999 AMERICAN GASTROENTEROLOGICAL AS, XP002117693 [PX] 1-7,10,12-15,21,22 * see abstract G3156 * |