Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0069495 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9910669 | 13.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4187899 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9910669 | 13.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1073489 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9910669 | 13.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2302689 | 13.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9910669 | 13.05.1999 |