EP1073489 - SURGICAL VISUALIZATION AND MOISTURIZING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chase Medical Inc. 1876 Firman Drive Richardson, TX 75081 / US | [2001/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SURESH, Mitta 3201 Tam O'Shanter Richardson, TX 75080 / US | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al ABEL & IMRAY, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99925631.6 | 13.05.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999US10669 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0069495 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073489 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M13/00, A61M3/02 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
A61M3/0279 (EP,US);
A61M13/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/37] |
Former [2001/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDWIEDERGABE UND BEFEUCHTUNG | [2001/06] | English: | SURGICAL VISUALIZATION AND MOISTURIZING DEVICE | [2001/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VISUALISATION ET D'HYDRATATION CHIRURGICAL | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/24] | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.08.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.08.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE1516442 (RITTER AG) [X] 1 * page 8, line 1 - page 12, line 19; figure - * [Y] 2-19; | [YD]US5336170 (SALERNO TOMAS A [US], et al) [YD] 2-19 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 20; figure - *; | [A]GB176789 (FRIEDRICH CONRAD BECK) [A] 1 * page 2, line 75 - line 122; figure - * | by applicant | US5336170 |