EP1077695 - COMPOUNDS HAVING IgE AFFECTING PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVANIR PHARMACEUTICALS 9393 Towne Centre Drive No. 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Avanir Pharmaceuticals 9393 Towne Centre Drive No. 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIRCAR, Jagadish Avanir Pharmaceuticals 9393 Towne Centre Drive 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
RICHARDS, Mark, L. Avanir Pharmaceuticals 9393 Towne Centre Drive 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
CAMPBELL, Michael, G. Avanir Pharmaceuticals 9393 Towne Centre Drive 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
MAJOR, Michael, W. Avanir Pharmaceuticals 9393 Towne Centre Drive 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99925756.1 | 21.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US11363 | Priority number, date | US19980086494P | 22.05.1998 Original published format: US 86494 P | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9961013 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077695 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/335, A61K31/445, A61K31/395, A61K31/165, A61K31/18, A61K31/40, A61K31/42, A61K31/135, A61K31/535 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/415 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4545, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Extension states | AL | 01.12.2000 | LT | 01.12.2000 | LV | 01.12.2000 | MK | 01.12.2000 | RO | 01.12.2000 | SI | 01.12.2000 | Title | German: | IgE-BEEINFLUSSENDE VERBINDUNGEN | [2001/09] | English: | COMPOUNDS HAVING IgE AFFECTING PROPERTIES | [2001/09] | French: | COMPOSES AYANT DES PROPRIETES AFFECTANT LES IgE | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0221346 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1,2,22,25 * whole document, especially examples 2, 25 and 48; and page 4, lines 26-47 *; | [Y]EP0232199 (CIRD [FR]) [Y] 1,2,22-25 * page 1; claim - *; | [X]WO9009989 (ROTTA RESEARCH LAB [IT]) [X] 1,2,22,25 * page 1 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 2; examples 5,7,8; claim - * * page 23, paragraph L - page 24 *; | [Y]EP0469477 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1,2,22-25 * page 2, lines 1-30 * * page 3, line 26 * * page 3, lines 41-47 *; | [X]EP0497564 (RHONE POULENC RORER LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,22,25 * page 2 - page 4, line 15; claim - *; | [X]WO9325517 (CELLTECH LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,22,25 * page 2, lines 9-18; examples 13,15,16,19; claim - *; | [X] - S. KARAG'OZOV, "Synthesis of N-acyl derivatives of 6-amino-1,4-benzodioxane", STN INTERNATIONAL. FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS. AN=112:98470, XP002119692 [X] 3,22 * abstract * | [ ] - FARMATSIYA, (1989), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 5 - 8 |