EP1080589 - METHOD FOR TRACKING TRANSACTION DATA FOR AN APPLICATION IN A WIRELESS MESSAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glenayre Electronics, Inc. 5345 Carnegie Boulevard Charlotte North Carolina 28209 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Glenayre Electronics, Inc. 5345 Carnegie Boulevard Charlotte, North Carolina 28209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TKATCH, Randy, T. 20 South Grosvenor Avenue Burnaby, British Columbia V5B 3N8 / CA | 02 /
QUON, Colin, S., C. 2031 East 23rd Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5N 2T9 / CA | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Spall, Christopher John BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99925772.8 | 24.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US11396 | Priority number, date | US19980085888 | 27.05.1998 Original published format: US 85888 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962276 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080589 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/12 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H04W88/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, LI, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERFOLGEN VON TRANSAKTIONSDATEN FÜR EINE ANWENDUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NACHRICHTENSYSTEM | [2001/10] | English: | METHOD FOR TRACKING TRANSACTION DATA FOR AN APPLICATION IN A WIRELESS MESSAGING SYSTEM | [2001/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE SUIVI DE DONNEES DE TRANSACTION POUR UNE APPLICATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE MESSAGERIE SANS FIL | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 10.09.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US5809415 (ROSSMANN ALAIN [US]); | [X]US5918158 (LAPORTA THOMAS F [US], et al) |