EP1082351 - CATALYST DELIVERY METHOD AND CATALYST FEEDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Revocation of patent | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies LLC Suite 1950, 5555 San Felipe Houston, TX 77056 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Univation Technologies LLC Suite 1950, 5555 San Felipe Houston, TX 77056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGAPIOU, Agapios, K. 19911 17th Green Court Humble, TX 77346 / US | 02 /
RUSSELL, Kathryn, A. 1202 Goldendale Drive Seabrook, TX 77586 / US | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2001/11] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99925935.1 | 27.05.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999US11747 | Priority number, date | US19980087024 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: US 87024 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9961486 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082351 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1082351 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/40, C08F10/00, C08F4/607, B01J8/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
B01J8/0005 (EP,US);
B01J8/003 (EP,US);
B01J8/004 (EP,US);
B01J8/24 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00162 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00164 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00186 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/005 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F2/34 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/61916 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | KATALYSATORZUGABEVERFAHREN UND KATALYSATORZUGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2001/11] | English: | CATALYST DELIVERY METHOD AND CATALYST FEEDER | [2001/11] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE DISTRIBUTION DE CATALYSEUR ET DISTRIBUTEUR DE CATALYSEUR | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 20.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.2004
21.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Basell Polyolefine GmbH Intellectual Property Industriepark Hoechst - E 413 65926 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.2004
21.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Basell Polyolefine GmbH Intellectual Property Industriepark Hoechst - E 413 65926 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2004/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.2004
21.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Basell Polyolefine GmbH Intellectual Property - F206 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 14.05.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.11.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.02.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.02.2008 | 05.02.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.06.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/45] | 21.06.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | NL | 01.12.2006 | IT | 27.05.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/18] | ES | 29.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | BE | 31.05.2006 | |
NL | 01.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | NL | 01.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US3779712 (CALVERT W, et al) [DX] 15-18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0495300 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 15-18 * figure -; claim - *; | [DXY]WO9611960 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1,2,5-14 * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 29 * * page 13, line 10 - line 29 * * page 15, line 21 - line 23; claim - * [Y] 1-14; | [X]EP0776691 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 15 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE19615953 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-14 * page 8, line 25 - line 30; claim - *; | [X]EP0810233 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-14 * examples 7-11; claim - *; | [Y]WO9820045 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 17, paragraph 2 * * page 22, line 3 - page 23, line 8; claim - *; | [PX]WO9837102 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [PX] 15* page 23, paragraph 3 - page 26, paragraph 1; claim - * | by applicant | US5283218 | US3248179 | US4159965 | US4271060 | US4325837 | US4530914 | US4543399 | US4588790 | US4613484 | US4665208 | US4701432 | EP0277003 | EP0277004 | US4871705 | US4874734 | US4908463 | US4924018 | US4935474 | US4937299 | US4952540 | US4968827 | EP0420436 | WO9104257 | EP0426637 | US5017714 | US5028670 | US5055438 | US5066741 | US5077255 | WO9200333 | US5091352 | US5096867 | US5103031 | US5120867 | US5124418 | EP0495375 | EP0500944 | US5153157 | US5157137 | EP0520732 | US5183867 | US5198401 | US5204419 | US5206199 | US5206197 | US5210352 | US5229478 | US5235081 | US5241025 | EP0561476 | US5248801 | US5264405 | EP0570982 | US5278119 | US5278264 | US5281679 | EP0591756 | WO9407928 | US5304614 | EP0594218 | US5308815 | EP0279586 | WO9410180 | US5317036 | US5324800 | US5329032 | US5332706 | US5347025 | US5350723 | US5352749 | US5359015 | US5384299 | US5387568 | US5391790 | US5391789 | US5391793 | US5391529 | US5391660 | US5395810 | EP0485823 | US5399636 | US5405922 | US5408017 | WO9514044 | US5427991 | US5436304 | US5453410 | US5453471 | US5455366 | US5462999 | US5470811 | US5473028 | US5491207 | US5492975 | WO9608520 | US5502124 | EP0485822 | US5534473 | US5539124 | WO9623010 | EP0743324 | US5589555 | WO9706186 | US5616661 | US5621126 | WO9714721 | WO9715602 | US5627243 | US5627242 | US5643847 | WO9727224 | US5661095 | US5665818 | EP0794200 | US5668228 | EP0634421 | US5677375 | EP0802202 | US5684098 | US5691264 | US5693730 | US5693838 | US5698634 | US5710297 | US5712354 | US5712352 | US5714427 | US5714555 | US5719241 | WO9807515 | US5723399 | EP0518092 | US5728641 | US5728839 | US5731253 | US5731451 | US5744656 | EP0615981 | US5753577 | US19940285380 |