EP1080210 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING A POLYPEPTIDE BY MODIFYING THE COPY NUMBER OF A GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes Biotech, Inc. 1445 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2001/47] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH, INC. 1445 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95616-4880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAVER, Debbie, S. 2809 Albany Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Stahr, Pia Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Stahr, Pia Novo Nordisk A/S, Corporate Patents, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 99925956.7 | 27.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US11816 | Priority number, date | US19980085505 | 27.05.1998 Original published format: US 85505 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9961651 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1080210 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/67, C12N15/69, C12N15/55, C12N15/56, C12N15/90, C12N9/20, C12N9/42, C12N1/14, C12P21/02 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
C12N9/2437 (EP);
C12N15/69 (EP);
C12N15/902 (EP);
C12N9/20 (EP);
C12P21/02 (EP);
C12Y302/01004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POLYPEPTIDES DURCH MODIFIZIERUNG DER KOPIEZAHL DES GENS | [2001/10] | English: | METHODS FOR PRODUCING A POLYPEPTIDE BY MODIFYING THE COPY NUMBER OF A GENE | [2001/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN POLYPEPTIDE EN MODIFIANT LE NOMBRE DE COPIES D'UN GENE | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 15.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9811203 (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC) [DA] 1-37 * examples 24-28; claims 1-54 *; | [A]EP0343783 (BIOGEN INC) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]FR2563533 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9201800 (CHIRON CORP) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO8803169 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9109955 (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS ;CHAPPEL SCOTT C (US)) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9531560 (HEARTLEIN MICHAEL W ;TRANSKARYOTIC THERAPIES INC (US); TRECO DOUGL) [A] * the whole document * |