EP1112638 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MULTICASTING CALL NOTIFICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARCHER, Michael Apt. 209, 5616 Spring Valley Road Dallas, TX 75240 / US | [2001/34] |
Former [2001/27] | 01 /
ARCHER, Michael Apt. 1063, 5704 Spring Valley Dallas, TX 75240 / US | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 10a 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 10 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99926077.1 | 28.05.1999 | [2001/27] | WO1999US12039 | Priority number, date | US19980104570 | 25.06.1998 Original published format: US 104570 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9967922 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112638 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/00, H04M3/46, H04M7/00 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
H04L12/1822 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04M3/46 (EP,US);
H04M3/465 (EP,US);
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04M7/1205 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5642 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5656 (EP,US);
H04M2203/205 (EP,US);
H04M2203/5063 (EP,US);
H04M3/42229 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/27] | H04L12/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM MULTICASTING VON ANRUFBENACHRICHTIGUNGEN | [2001/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MULTICASTING CALL NOTIFICATIONS | [2001/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE MULTIDIFFUSION DES INDICATIONS D'APPELS | [2001/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/16] | Request for further processing for: | 22.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 22.10.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0549126 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 16 * [A] 8,9 [Y] 3-5,10-19; | [YA]WO9806201 (INTELLIGENCE AT LARGE [US]) [Y] 3-5,10-19 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph L * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph 2 * * page 18, paragraph 1 - page 21, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]WO9726748 (PILGRIM TELEPHONE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * column A * * page 17, paragraph L - page 19, paragraph 1 * [A] 3-5,10-19 | International search | [YE]US5915008 (DULMAN SCOTT [US]); | [Y]US5553135 (XING XIE-HAO [US]) |