EP1083968 - FLOW-THROUGH ELECTROPORATION SYSTEM FOR $i(EX VIVO) GENE THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genetronics, Inc. 11199-A Sorrento Valley Road San Diego, CA 92121-1334 / US | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Gunter, A. 3750 Rivera Drive San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
RABUSSAY, Dietmar 518 North Rios Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Heunemann, Dieter Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Heunemann, Dieter, Dr. Vossius & Partner, Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99926108.4 | 01.06.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999US12136 | Priority number, date | US19980090471 | 03.06.1998 Original published format: US 90471 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962592 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083968 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/30, A61N1/32 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A61N1/325 (EP,US);
A61N1/327 (EP,US);
C12M35/02 (EP);
A61N1/306 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | A61N1/32 | ||
Former IPC [2001/12] | A61N1/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSS-ELEKTROPORATIONSSYSTEM FÜR $I (EX VIVO) GEN-THERAPIE | [2001/12] | English: | FLOW-THROUGH ELECTROPORATION SYSTEM FOR $i(EX VIVO) GENE THERAPY | [2001/12] | French: | TECHNIQUE D'ELECTROPORATION A FLUX TRAVERSANT POUR THERAPIE GENIQUE $i(EX VIVO) | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9749450 (GENETRONICS INC [US]) [A] * page 13, line 11 - page 14, line 18 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 7 * * page 21, line 16 - line 33 * * page 23, line 1 - line 10; figure - * | International search | [X]US5612207 (NICOLAU YVES C [US], et al); | [AP]US5854039 (RAYMOND CHRISTOPHER K [US], et al); | [AP]US5873849 (BERNARD ROBERT M [US]); | [A]US5128257 (BAER BRADFORD W [US]) | by applicant | US5019034 | US5676646 | US5545130 | US5702359 | US4822470 |