EP1084221 - DETERGENTS CONTAINING AMYLASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTTWITZ, Beatrix Urdenbacher Allee 51 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SPECKMANN, Horst-Dieter Eichenfeldstrasse 24 a D-40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
MAURER, Karl-Heinz Dechenstrasse 5 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 04 /
NITSCH, Christian Otto-Hahn-Strasse 185 D-40591 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/12] | Application number, filing date | 99926389.0 | 25.05.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999EP03571 | Priority number, date | DE1998124686 | 03.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19824686 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963039 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084221 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C11D1/83 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D3/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/12] | Title | German: | AMYLASE ENTHALTENDE WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2001/12] | English: | DETERGENTS CONTAINING AMYLASE | [2001/12] | French: | DETERGENTS CONTENANT UNE AMYLASE | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9811190 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * page 7, line 19 - page 9, line 17 * * page 20, line 1 - line 14 * * claims 1-10 *; | [PX]EP0861885 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1,5,7-9 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 26 * * page 9, line 11 - line 36 * * claims 1-10 *; | [PA]EP0878535 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PA] 1-4,6,8,9 * page 8, line 10 - line 44 ** claims 1,2 * |