EP1092019 - HUMAN HOMOLOGUE OF UNC-53 PROTEIN OF C. ELEGANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutsebaan 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUYTEN, Walter Herman Maria L. Janssen Pharm. N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
DE RAEYMAEKER, Marc C. Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 03 /
GEYSEN, Johan Jozef Gustave H. Janssen Pharm. N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 04 /
BOGAERT, Thierry, A., O., E. Wolvendreef 26G B-8500 Kortrijk / BE | 05 /
MAERTENS, Luc, Jacques, Simon Devgen N.V. Blok DF 1.60.14 Technologiepark Zwijnaarde 9 B-9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | 06 /
VERHASSELT, Peter Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 07 /
VAN DE CRAEN, Marc Devgen N.V. Blok DF 1.60.14 Technologiepark Zwijnaarde 9 B-9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99926511.9 | 02.06.1999 | [2001/16] | WO1999EP03848 | Priority number, date | GB19980011962 | 03.06.1998 Original published format: GB 9811962 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963080 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092019 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/16] | Extension states | AL | 23.11.2000 | LT | 23.11.2000 | LV | 23.11.2000 | MK | 23.11.2000 | RO | 23.11.2000 | SI | 23.11.2000 | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHES HOMOLOG DES UNC-53 PROTEIN VON C. ELEGANS | [2001/16] | English: | HUMAN HOMOLOGUE OF UNC-53 PROTEIN OF C. ELEGANS | [2001/16] | French: | HOMOLOGUE HUMAIN DE LA PROTEINE UNC-53 DE C. ELEGANS | [2001/16] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9638555 (BOGAERT THIERRY [BE], et al) [X] 1-31,49-54,60-67,72-80,85,88,91-95 * page 1 - page 99; claims 1-88 *; | [PX]WO9824810 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [PX] 1-31,49-54,60-67,72-80,85,88,91-95 * page 1 - page 97 * * claims 1-125 *; | [A] - HEKIMI S ET AL, "AXONAL GUIDANCE DEFECTS IN A CAENORHABDITID ELEGANS MUTANT REVEAL CELL-EXTRINSIC DETERMINANTS OF NEURONAL MORPHOLOGY", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (19931001), vol. 13, no. 10, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 4254 - 4271, XP000612286 [A] 1,21-26 * the whole document * | [A] - BAIROCH A., "The PROSITE dictionary of sites and patterns in proteins, its current status", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH., OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY., GB, (1993), vol. 21, no. 13, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3097 - 3103, XP002121559 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [DPX] - NAGASE T ET AL., "Human mRNA for KIAA0930 protein", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19990409), XP002121417 [DPX] 1-11 * abstract * |