EP1084473 - PAPER STOCK SHEAR AND FORMATION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Honeywell-Measurex Corporation One Results Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGART-ALEXANDER, Claud 3820 West 17th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1A4 / CA | 02 /
HU, Hung-Tzaw 19786 Merribrook Drive Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 03 /
WATSON, John, David Apartment No. 2901, 2269 West Lakeshore Boulevard Etobicoke, Ontario M8V 3X6 / CA | 04 /
PRESTON, John, G. 169 Doud Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/48] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/12] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Honeywell AG, Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 99927309.7 | 07.06.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999US12729 | Priority number, date | US19980093529 | 08.06.1998 Original published format: US 93529 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9964963 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084473 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084473 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F19/00, G06G7/66, D21G9/00 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
D21G9/0027 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/12] | G06F17/00, G06F19/00, G06G7/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2001/12] | Title | German: | PAPIERVORRATS SCHNITT- UND FORMATIONSKONTROLLE | [2001/12] | English: | PAPER STOCK SHEAR AND FORMATION CONTROL | [2001/12] | French: | COMMANDE DE FORMATION ET DE CISAILLEMENT DES FIBRES DE PATE A PAPIER | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XP]US5853543 (HU HUNG-TZAW [US], et al); | [XE]US5928475 (CHASE LEE [US], et al); | [X]US4374703 (LEBEAU LOUIS [FR], et al) | Examination | WO9958991 |