EP1094824 - PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT FOR CREATION/MAINTENANCE OF HEALTH-PROTECTIVE INTESTINAL MICROFLORA AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE IMMUNE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crum, Albert B. 77 Remsen Street Brooklyn Heights, NY 11201 / US | [2004/40] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Crum, Albert B. 77 Remsen Street Brooklyn Heights, NY 11201 / US | ||
For all designated states Zivkovic, D. Dorothy 10905 Barrington Court Cincinnatti, OH 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/18] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99927472.3 | 10.06.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999US13218 | Priority number, date | US19980095383 | 10.06.1998 Original published format: US 95383 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9964022 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094824 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094824 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/20, A23C9/20, A23L1/30, A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A61P37/04 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
A61K35/20 (EP,US);
A23C9/206 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/165 (EP,US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54252, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/1626, A23V2250/062 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54252, A23V2250/28, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/1944, A23V2250/506, A23V2250/1626, A23V2250/062, A23V2250/211 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/15] | A61K35/20, A23C9/20, A23L1/30, A23L1/304, A23L1/305 | ||
Former IPC [2001/18] | A61K35/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | VORBEUGENDER UND THERAPEUTISCHER NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSATZ ZUR SCHAFFUNG/ERHALTUNG EINER DIE GESUNDHEIT SCHÜTZENDEN DARMMIKROFLORA UND ZUR STÄRKUNG DES IMMUNSYSTEMS | [2001/18] | English: | PROPHYLACTIC AND THERAPEUTIC NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT FOR CREATION/MAINTENANCE OF HEALTH-PROTECTIVE INTESTINAL MICROFLORA AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE IMMUNE SYSTEM | [2001/18] | French: | COMPLEMENT NUTRITIONNEL PROPHYLACTIQUE ET THERAPEUTIQUE DESTINE A LA CREATION/AU MAINTIEN D'UNE MICROFLORE INTESTINALE PROTECTRICE DE LA SANTE ET AU RENFORCEMENT DU SYSTEME IMMUNITAIRE | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 19.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Request for further processing for: | 25.07.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2006 | BE | 05.04.2006 | CH | 05.04.2006 | CY | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | IT | 05.04.2006 | LI | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | LU | 10.06.2006 | IE | 12.06.2006 | FR | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | ES | 16.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | DE | 03.01.2007 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
LU | 10.06.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
FR | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 03.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
FR | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 03.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 03.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
DE | 03.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 05.07.2006 | |
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4413839 (FRITZ KOCH PHARMA GMBH DR MED [DE]) [A] 1-9* abstract * | International search | [Y]US4377569 (PLYMATE ROBERT R [US]); | [Y]US4512977 (LUNDY JOSEPH R [US]); | [Y]US4784852 (JOHANSSON ERLAND [SE]); | [Y]US5456924 (BOUNOUS GUSTAVO [CA], et al); | [Y]US5531989 (PAUL STEPHEN M [US]); | [Y]US5645834 (COCKRUM RICHARD H [US]); | [XP]US5785990 (LANGREHR JANA S [US]); | [XP]US5795602 (CRAIG WILLIAM MICHAEL [US], et al); | [YP]US5846569 (ANDERSON MICHAEL R [US], et al) |