EP1080107 - NOVEL PEPTIDES WHICH REPRESENT THE EPITOPES OF THE HUMAN HERPES VIRUS TYPE 8 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/10] | NOVEL (POLY)PEPTIDES WHICH REPRESENT THE EPITOPES OF THE HUMAN HERPES VIRUS TYPE 8 | ||
[2011/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): IE | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotrin Intellectual Properties Limited 93 The Rise Mount Merrion County Dublin / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Biotrin Intellectual Properties Limited 93 The Rise Mount Merrion, County Dublin / IE | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Schatz, Octavian Steinbergstrasse 30 85250 Altomünster / DE | ||
For all designated states Haas, Jürgen Brunellenweg 39 80689 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schatz, Octavian Steinbergstrasse 30 85250 Altomünster / DE | 02 /
Haas, Jürgen Brunellenweg 39 80689 München / DE | [2002/45] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/10] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99927793.2 | 28.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999EP03719 | Priority number, date | DE1998124244 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19824244 | [2001/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9962938 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1080107 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080107 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/03, C07K16/08, C12N15/38, A61K38/16, A61K39/245, G01N33/68 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16222 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [2001/10] | Title | German: | NEUE PEPTIDE, DIE EPITOPE DES HUMANEN HERPESVIRUS 8 DARSTELLEN | [2011/27] | English: | NOVEL PEPTIDES WHICH REPRESENT THE EPITOPES OF THE HUMAN HERPES VIRUS TYPE 8 | [2011/27] | French: | NOUVEAUX PEPTIDES REPRESENTANT DES EPITOPES DU VIRUS 8 DE L'HERPES HUMAIN | [2011/27] |
Former [2001/10] | POLYPEPTIDE, HERKOMMLICH VON DEM HUMANEN HERPESVIRUS 8 UND DEREN DIAGNOSTISCHE UND MEDISCHE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2001/10] | NOVEL (POLY)PEPTIDES WHICH REPRESENT THE EPITOPES OF THE HUMAN HERPES VIRUS TYPE 8 | ||
Former [2001/10] | NOUVEAUX (POLY)PEPTIDES REPRESENTANT DES EPITOPES DU VIRUS 8 DE L'HERPES HUMAIN | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.01.2012 | ES | 15.04.2012 | AT | 28.05.2012 | GB | 28.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | IE | 13.07.2012 | [2015/45] |
Former [2013/36] | IE | 04.01.2012 | |
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
AT | 28.05.2012 | ||
GB | 28.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | IE | 04.01.2012 | |
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
GB | 28.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | IE | 04.01.2012 | |
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
GB | 28.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | IE | 04.01.2012 | |
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
GB | 28.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | IE | 04.01.2012 | |
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | IE | 04.01.2012 | |
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | IE | 04.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9615779 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [A] 1,3-30* the whole document *; | [X]WO9731932 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,3-18,22-25,27-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9804576 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [A] 1,3-30 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9811132 (UNIV LIVERPOOL [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-18,22-25,27-30 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0893504 (BIOTEST AG [DE]) [PX] 1,6-18,22-25,27-30 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0950666 (GSF FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM UMWELT [DE]) [E] 1,6-18,22-30 * the whole document *; | [PX] - TEDESCHI E.A., "Human serum antibodies to a major defined epitope of HHV8 small viral capsid antigen", J.INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (199904), vol. 179, no. 4, pages 1016 - 1020, XP000857350 [PX] 1,6-18,22-25,27-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/314657 | [PX] - PAU CP ET AL, "Mapping and serodiagnostic application of a dominant epitope within the human herpesvirus 8 ORF 65-encoded protein", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY,US,WASHINGTON, DC, vol. 36, no. 6, ISSN 0095-1137, page 1574-1577-1577, XP002103027 [PX] 1,6-18,22-25,27-30 * the whole document * | [AD] - DAVIS DA ET AL, "Detection of serum antibodies to a Kaposi's sarcoma- associated herpesvirus-specific peptide", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES,US,CHICAGO, IL, vol. 175, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1899, page 1071-1079-1079, XP002103028 [AD] 1,3-30 * the whole document * |