EP1086312 - PISTON-TYPE ACCUMULATOR FOR A HYDRAULIC FLUID TO BE SUPPLIED TO A CONSUMER IN A HYDRAULIC INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDAC TECHNOLOGY GMBH Industriegebiet 66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states HYDAC Technology GmbH Industriegebiet 66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOLL, Josef Im Hanfgarten 19a D-66636 Tholey / DE | 02 /
BALTES, Herbert Bornstrasse 22 D-66679 Losheim / DE | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99927842.7 | 02.06.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999EP03816 | Priority number, date | DE19981027363 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19827363 | [2001/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9967536 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086312 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086312 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/24 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
B61D7/28 (EP,US);
F15B1/027 (EP,US);
F15B1/24 (EP,US);
F15B2201/205 (EP,US);
F15B2201/31 (EP,US);
F15B2201/411 (EP,US);
F15B2201/4155 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | KOLBENSPEICHER FÜR EINEM VERBRAUCHER IN EINER HYDRAULIKANLAGE ZUZUFÜHRENDES DRUCKFLUID | [2001/13] | English: | PISTON-TYPE ACCUMULATOR FOR A HYDRAULIC FLUID TO BE SUPPLIED TO A CONSUMER IN A HYDRAULIC INSTALLATION | [2001/13] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR A PISTON POUR FLUIDE DE PRESSION A AMENER A UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR DANS UNE INSTALLATION HYDRAULIQUE | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 03.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Bolenz & Schäfer GmbH Lahnstrasse 34 35216 Biedenkopf / DE Opponent's representative Olbricht, Karl Heinrich Olbricht & Buchhold, Am Weinberg 15 35096 Weimar/Lahn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Bolenz & Schäfer GmbH Lahnstrasse 34 35216 Biedenkopf / DE Opponent's representative Olbricht, Karl Heinrich, Dipl.-Phys. Olbricht & Buchhold, Am Weinberg 15 35096 Weimar/Lahn / DE | 05.04.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.09.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.05.2005 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.05.2005 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.06.2004 | IE | 02.06.2004 | LU | 02.06.2004 | CH | 30.06.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | PT | 02.12.2004 | GR | 05.01.2005 | [2005/46] |
Former [2005/26] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
LU | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
PT | 02.12.2004 | ||
GR | 05.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
LU | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
PT | 02.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
LU | 02.06.2004 | ||
PT | 02.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
LU | 02.06.2004 | ||
PT | 02.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/20] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
PT | 02.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 02.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1297881 (M. JEAN-LOUIS GRATZMULLER) [A] 2 * page 3, column 1, lines 26-28; figure - *; | [XA]DE1185025 (MONTAN HYDRAULIK G M B H & CO) [X] 1,2,7 * figure . * [A] 3; | [A]DE1188247 (FRIEDRICH STUEBBE) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3744179 (INTEGRAL HYDRAULIK CO [DE]) [A] 8* figure . *; | [DA]DE9113007U (BOLENZ & SCHÄFER) [DA] 1 * figure - * |