Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9852874 | Global Dossier | 25.03.1999 | A3 | WO9852874 | 26.11.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85934097 | 20.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002518164 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9913374 | 14.06.1999 | US9804798 | 16.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002502307 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US85934097 | 20.05.1997 | US9810568 | 20.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1017628 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2002 | B1 | EP1017628 | 12.07.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85934097 | 20.05.1997 | US9810568 | 20.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1089943 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9913374 | 14.06.1999 | US9804798 | 16.06.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE226921T | 15.11.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US85934097 | 20.05.1997 | US9810568 | 20.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69809079T | 17.07.2003 | T2 | DE69809079D1 | 05.12.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US85934097 | 20.05.1997 | US9810568 | 20.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5919357 | 06.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9804798 | 16.06.1998 | US85934097 | 20.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5925240 | 20.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US85934097 | 20.05.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9965832 | Global Dossier | 23.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9804798 | 16.06.1998 |