EP1089943 - FILTER CARTRIDGE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTV S.A. L'Aquarène, 1 place Montgolfier 94417 Saint-Maurice Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states OTV S.A. L'Aquarène, 1 place Montgolfier 94417 Saint-Maurice Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states United States Filter Corporation 40-004 Cook Street Palm Desert, CA 92211 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKINS, Fredrick, C. 2 Sirius Lane Pepperell, MA 01463 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Arthur, F. 28 Hawstead Hollow Nashua, NH 03063 / US | 03 /
BENDLIN, Herbert 56235 Ransbach-Baumbach / DE | 04 /
YONJAN, Bikram 27 Carey Avenue, G2 Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2009/48] |
Former [2001/15] | Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99928638.8 | 14.06.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999US13374 | Priority number, date | US19980098047 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: US 98047 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9965832 | Date: | 23.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089943 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/00, C02F1/28, C02F1/32, C02F1/42, C02F1/44, B01D35/30, B01D36/00 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
C02F1/008 (EP,US);
C02F9/20 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (EP,US);
G05D7/0676 (EP,US);
C02F2201/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | FILTERKARTUSCHENANORDNUNG | [2001/15] | English: | FILTER CARTRIDGE ASSEMBLY | [2001/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE A CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 17.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB928553 (ROOSA VERNON D) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3266628 (PRICE HAROLD A) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4301009 (COOK DON E, et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4369110 (PICEK ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 29 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]US5378370 (BRANE EARL P [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 4 * * column 10, line 8 - line 20; figure 3 * * column 10, line 34 - column 11, line 19 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5575833 (GRIFFIN GARY E [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 6, line 42 - line 50; figures 2A,3,4 * |