EP1076752 - FRAME COVERING FOR HEAT INSULATION IN WINDOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/08] | DEVICE FOR IMPROVING HEAT INSULATION IN WINDOWS | ||
[2003/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolaschnik, Achim Klaus Kepplerstrasse 2-4 30853 Langenhagen / DE | [2001/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Seewald, Jürgen, et al Brümmerstedt Oelfke Seewald & König Theaterstrasse 6 30159 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Seewald, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Brümmerstedt Oelfke Seewald & König, Theaterstrasse 6 30159 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99929052.1 | 28.04.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999DE01266 | Priority number, date | DE1998122128 | 07.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19822128 | [2001/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958801 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076752 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076752 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/30, E06B3/263, E06B7/23, E06B7/14 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
E06B3/308 (EP,US);
E06B7/14 (EP,US);
E06B7/231 (EP,US);
E06B1/325 (EP,US);
E06B3/26345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2001/08] | Title | German: | RAHMENVERKLEIDUNG ZUR WÄRMEDÄMMUNG VON FENSTERN | [2003/05] | English: | FRAME COVERING FOR HEAT INSULATION IN WINDOWS | [2003/05] | French: | GARNITURE DE CADRE POUR L'ISOLATION THERMIQUE DE FENETRES | [2003/05] |
Former [2001/08] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER WÄRMEDÄMMUNG VON FENSTERN | ||
Former [2001/08] | DEVICE FOR IMPROVING HEAT INSULATION IN WINDOWS | ||
Former [2001/08] | DISPOSITIF POUR AMELIORER L'ISOLATION THERMIQUE DE FENETRES | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.07.2003 | DK | 02.10.2003 | SE | 02.10.2003 | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/16] | NL | 02.07.2003 | |
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 02.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2432746 (BRUEGMANN & SOHN ZWEIGNIEDERLA) [A] 1-4 * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE2518800 (KELLER & CO GMBH) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2630463 (LECHLER CHEMIE GMBH) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]EP0014498 (SIMEC NV [BE]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 23; figures 1,3,4 *; | [Y]DE9313387U (FINGERLING KARL HEINZ [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; figure - *; | [A]FR2714693 (AMBONATI FRERES SARL [FR]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 5; figure 1 *; | [PX]DE19716556 (GESEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [PX] 1,5,6* column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 49; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE2621365 |