EP1093357 - METHOD OF REDUCING OR PREVENTING MALODOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [2001/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHAN, John Martin The Forge, The Green, Boughton Aluph Ashford, Kent TN25 4JB / GB | 02 /
MINHAS, Tony 30 King Edward Avenue Dartford, Kent DA1 2HZ / GB | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99929591.8 | 06.07.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999GB02170 | Priority number, date | GB19980014646 | 07.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9814646 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001358 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093357 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093357 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/32, A61K7/46 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A61K8/33 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE FÜR DIE VERMINDERUNG ODER DIE VERHINDERUNG DES KÖRPERGERUCHS | [2001/17] | English: | METHOD OF REDUCING OR PREVENTING MALODOUR | [2001/17] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE OU DE PREVENIR LES MAUVAISES ODEURS | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 28.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.2004 | BE | 07.01.2004 | CH | 07.01.2004 | CY | 07.01.2004 | FI | 07.01.2004 | LI | 07.01.2004 | NL | 07.01.2004 | DK | 07.04.2004 | GR | 07.04.2004 | SE | 07.04.2004 | ES | 18.04.2004 | PT | 07.06.2004 | IE | 06.07.2004 | LU | 06.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
CY | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
NL | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
NL | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
IE | 06.07.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
LU | 06.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
DK | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
BE | 07.01.2004 | ||
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
ES | 18.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
CH | 07.01.2004 | ||
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
LI | 07.01.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 07.01.2004 | |
FI | 07.01.2004 | ||
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
GR | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 07.01.2004 | |
SE | 07.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5260053 (CHAPPELL KATHERINE C [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 30 * * column 1, line 49 - line 68 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 7 * * claims 1,2,15 *; | [X]EP0692195 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 2, line 46 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 44 - line 56 * * claims 1,2,10,19 *; | [X]US5554588 (BEHAN JOHN M [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * examples 5-8 *; | [X]WO9730689 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * * example J * * examples 75-83 * * claims 1,3,4 *; | [X]WO9816194 (QUEST INT [NL], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 4, paragraph 8 * * claim - *; | [A]FR2756740 (NISHIYAMA KENICHI [JP]) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 30 * * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 6 - line 12 * * examples 3-5 * * page 11, line 22 - line 30 *; | [A] - FELLAHI Y ET AL, "Synthesis and antibacterial activity of 2-substituted 5-91,2 -diarylethyl)-4,6-dichloropyrimidine derivatives", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY.CHIMICA THERAPEUTICA, (19950101), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0223-5234, page 633-639, XP004040189 [A] 1,8,10 * abstract * * table IV * * page 636, column 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0223-5234(96)88279-1 | [A] - MORRIS J A ET AL, "ANTIMICROBIAL ACTIVITY OF AROMA CHEMICALS AND ESSENTIAL OILS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (19790501), ISSN 0003-021X, pages 595 - 603, XP000645444 [A] 3 * page 595, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * table III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02660245 |