EP1097134 - ARYLPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS UROSELECTIVE ALPHA1-ADRENOCEPTOR BLOCKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited 19, Nehru Place New Delhi 110 019 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD. 19, Nehru Place New Delhi 110 019 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANAND, Nitya B-62, Nirala Nagar, Lucknow 226 007 Uttar Pradesh / IN | 02 /
SINHA, Neelima K-94, Sector-25, Noida 201 301 Uttar Pradesh / IN | 03 /
JAIN, Sanjay K-55, Sector-25, Noida 201 301 Uttar Pradesh / IN | 04 /
MEHTA, Anita L-19/3, Phase II-DLF, Qutab Enclave Gurgaon, 122 001, Haryana / IN | 05 /
SAXENA, Anil Kumar D-1051, Indira Nagar Lucknow 266 01, Uttar Pradesh / IN | 06 /
GUPTA, Jang, Bahadur C-41-B, Gangotri Enclave Alaknanda, New Delhi 110 019 / IN | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Cronin, Brian Harold John Cronin Intellectual Property Route de Clémenty 62 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2005/04] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd, 95 Park Lane Mayfair, London W1K 7TE / GB | ||
Former [2001/19] | Cronin, Brian Harold John Moinas Savoye & Cronin 42 rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 99929633.8 | 16.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999IB01296 | Priority number, date | US19980120265 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: US 120265 | WO1999IB00140 | 26.01.1999 Original published format: PCT/IB99/00140 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005205 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097134 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/40, C07D211/88, C07D401/06, A61K31/495 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
C07D207/404 (EP);
C07D207/408 (EP);
C07D211/88 (EP);
C07D401/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Extension states | AL | 21.02.2001 | LT | 21.02.2001 | LV | 21.02.2001 | MK | 21.02.2001 | RO | 21.02.2001 | SI | 21.02.2001 | Title | German: | ARYLPIPERAZIN DERIVATE VERWENDBAR ALS URO-SELECTIEVE ALPHA-1-ADRENOZEPTORENBLOCKERN | [2001/19] | English: | ARYLPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS UROSELECTIVE ALPHA1-ADRENOCEPTOR BLOCKERS | [2001/19] | French: | DERIVES D'ARYLPIPERAZINE UTILISES COMME AGENTS BLOQUANTS LES RECEPTEURS ALPHA1-ADRENERGIQUES UROSELECTIFS | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 13.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/31] | 13.06.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.06.2007 | 13.06.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2242382 (PFIZER) [X] 1,2,26 * example -; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0000220 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,26 * see Table IV, 32,33;; example 7; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0103357 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1,26 * page 13; claim 1 *; | [X]US4479954 (HIROSE NORIYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,26 * column 7, line 1 - line 2; claim 1 *; | [X]US4675403 (ABOU-GHARBIA MAGID A [US], et al) [X] 1,26 * example 3; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0748800 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1,26,27,32,37,42 * page 40, line 1 - line 3; claims 1,21 *; | [A]ES2094690 (UNIV MADRID COMPLUTENSE [ES]) [A] 1,26* abstract *; | [X] - MOKROSZ, MARIA J. ET AL, "Structure-activity relationship studies of CNS agents. Part 32. Effect o structural modifications in 1-arylpiperazine derivatives on.alpha.1-adrenoreceptor affinity", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980105), vol. 128, no. 1, Database accession no. 128, XP002103455 [X] 1,26,27 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Chemical Abstracts Service, XP002103462 [ ] * see compound with RN=159311-94-1 * | [ ] - ARCH. PHARM. (WEINHEIM, GER.) (1997), 330(6), 177-180 ;ISSN: 0365-6233 | [X] - KHADILKAR, B. M. ET AL, "Synthesis and hypotensive activity of some succinimide derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930719), vol. 119, no. 3, Database accession no. 27951, XP002103456 [X] 1,2,26 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Chemical Abstracts Service, XP002103463 [ ] * see compounds with RN=148304-50-1; 148304-49-8; 148304-48-7 * | [ ] - INDIAN J. CHEM., SECT. B (1993), 32B(3), 338-42 ;ISSN: 0376-4699 | [X] - WU, YAO-HUA ET AL, "Psychosedative agents. N-(4-phenyl-1-piperazinylalkyl)-substituted cycli imides", J. MED. CHEM. (1969), 12, 876-81, (1969), XP002103451 [X] 1,2,26 * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00305a037 | [X] - ISHIZUMI, KIKUO ET AL, "Synthesis and anxiolytic activity of N-substituted cyclic imides (1R*,2S*,3R*,4S*)-N-[4-[4-(2-pyrimidinyl)-1-piperazinyl]butyl]-2,3- bicyclo[2.2.1]heptanedicarboximide (tandospirone) and related compounds", CHEM. PHARM. BULL. (1991), 39(9), 2288-300 ;ISSN: 0009-2363, (1991), XP002103452 [X] 1,2,26 * the whole document * | [X] - KHADILKAR, B. M. ET AL, "Synthesis and pharmacology of some 2-[3-(4-aryl-1-piperazinyl)propyl]-1H- benz[de]isoquinolin-1,3(2H)-diones and -2,5-pyrrolidinediones", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871123), vol. 107, no. 21, Database accession no. 198046, XP002103457 [X] 1,2,26 * abstract * | [X] - DIMOGLO, A. S. ET AL, "Study of structure-activity relations in a series of buspirone analogs using an electron-topological approach", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980720), vol. 129, no. 3, Database accession no. 22916, XP002103458 [X] 1,26 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Chemical Abstracts Service, XP002103464 [ ] * see compound with RN=25024-93-5 * | [ ] - KHIM.-FARM. ZH. (1998), 32(1), 36-40 ;ISSN: 0023-1134 | [X] - RYAN, M. J. ET AL, "CI-926 (3-[4-[4-(3-methylphenyl)-1-piperazinyl]butyl]-2,4- imidazolinedione): antihypertensive profile and pharmacology", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19861110), vol. 105, no. 19, Database accession no. 164679, XP002103459 [X] 1,26 * abstract * | [X] - CHILMONCZYK, ZDZISLAW ET AL, "Conformational flexibility of serotonin1A receptor ligands from crystallographic data. Updated model of the receptor pharmacophore", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19971027), vol. 127, no. 17, Database accession no. 234308, XP002103460 [X] 1,26 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Chemical Abstracts Service, XP002103465 [ ] * see compound with RN=140245-72-3 * | [X] - HAYS, SHERYL J., "Synthesis of carbon-14 labeled CI-926 and CI-927, new antihypertensives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880118), vol. 108, no. 3, Database accession no. 21844, XP002103461 [X] 1,26 * abstract * | [AD] - B. KENNY ET AL, "Pharmacological Options in the Treatment of Benign Prostatic Hyperplasia", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., WASHINGTON US, (1997), vol. 40, no. 9, pages 1292 - 1315, XP002103453 [AD] 1,26,27,32 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960697s | [AD] - P.E. CROSS ET AL, "Substituted trifluoromethyl phenyl piperazines as anorectic agents", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY.CHIMICA THERAPEUTICA., PARIS FR, (1977), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 173 - 176, XP002103454 [AD] 1,26,46 | [A] - JERZY L MOKROSZ ET AL, "8-[4-[2-(1,2,3,4-tetrahydroisoquinolyl)butyl]-8-azaspiro[4,5]decane-7,9-dione: A new 5-HT1a receptor ligand with the same activity profile as buspirone", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19960101), vol. 5, no. 39, page 1125 1129, XP002074949 [A] 1,26 * see Chart 1 * |