EP1016276 - IMAGE IDENTIFICATION AND DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imageid Ltd. Amal Street 11, Park Afek 48092 Rosh Haayin / IL | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHNIBERG, Moti P.O. Box 603 44814 Elkana / IL | 02 /
NEMET, Yaron P.O. Box 183 44856 Kdumim / IL | 03 /
KESELBRENER, Michel Hanoter Street 49A 69698 Tel Aviv / IL | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99929685.8 | 13.07.1999 | [2000/27] | WO1999IL00385 | Priority number, date | IL19980125384 | 16.07.1998 Original published format: IL 12538498 | IL19990130121 | 24.05.1999 Original published format: IL 13012199 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0004711 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016276 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/91, H04N7/00, G06K9/00 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
G06K19/06046 (EP);
G06Q50/60 (KR);
G06Q30/06 (EP);
G06V40/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Extension states | AL | 24.03.2000 | LT | 24.03.2000 | LV | 24.03.2000 | MK | 24.03.2000 | RO | 24.03.2000 | SI | 24.03.2000 | Title | German: | BILDIDENTIFIZIERUNG UND LIEFERSYSTEM | [2000/27] | English: | IMAGE IDENTIFICATION AND DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2000/27] | French: | SYSTEME D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE DISTRIBUTION D'IMAGE | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 24.11.2000 | Observations by third parties | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/37] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5550928 (LU DAOZHENG [US], et al); | [X]US5694514 (EVANS JAMES GIFFORD [US], et al) | [Y] - BRANDOWSKI PAUL, "Stores Without Doors: Kiosks Generate New Profits", CORPORATE COMPUTING, (199210), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 193 - 196 | other | US5694514 | WO9810358 |