EP1118373 - EXHAUST GAS TREATING AGENT, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND METHOD OF TREATING EXHAUST GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO., LTD. 1, Kanda Mitoshiro-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0053 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO., LTD. 1, Kanda Mitoshiro-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0053 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Takanori 7-1-55, Minamiokajima, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 551-0021 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Hiroaki 7-1-55, Minamiokajima, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 551-0021 / JP | 03 /
KANAI, Kensuke 7-1-55, Minamiokajima, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 551-0021 / JP | 04 /
JAMI, Shingo 7-1-55, Minamiokajima, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 551-0021 / JP | 05 /
YUKUTAKE, Kouiti 7-1-55, Minamiokajima, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 551-0021 / JP | 06 /
KOBAYASHI, Shigehiro 7-1-55, Minamiokajima, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 551-0021 / JP | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99929755.9 | 08.07.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999JP03693 | Priority number, date | JP19980207778 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20777898 | [2001/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0004982 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118373 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118373 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/38, B01D53/81, B01D53/80, B09B3/00, B01D53/50, B01D53/64, B01D53/68, B01J20/04, B01J20/10 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
B01D53/508 (EP,US);
B01D53/80 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/38 (EP,US);
B01D53/502 (EP,US);
B01D53/685 (EP,US);
B01D53/81 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/30] | B01D53/38, B01D53/81, B01D53/80, B09B3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/20] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SUBSTANZ ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABGASEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABGAS | [2001/30] | English: | EXHAUST GAS TREATING AGENT, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND METHOD OF TREATING EXHAUST GAS | [2001/30] | French: | AGENT DE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ DE REJET, PRODUCTION DE CET AGENT, ET TRAITEMENT DES GAZ DE REJET | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2001 | Translation filed | 15.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 25.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5403808 (KENNEY MALCOLM E [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 45 *; | [X]WO8907974 (FLAEKT AB [SE]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 21 - page 8, line 23 * * page 11, lines 1-13; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5538537 (SCHMIDT MICHAEL DR RER NAT [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 33 - column 4, line 8 *; | [A]FR2615755 (RWK RHEIN WESTFAEL KALKWERKE [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 30 - page 8, line 13; example 2 * | International search | [A]JPH09108538 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH04371714 (OC ENG CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH0568847 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK); | [A]JPH02152520 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPS5969145 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD) |