EP1098444 - BS DIGITAL BROADCASTING RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12, Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 2967-3, Ishikawa-cyo Hachiouji-shi Tokyo 192-8525 / JP | ||
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiraishi, Kenichi Room 407 475-3, Kariba-cyo, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0025 / JP | 02 /
Shinjo, Soichi Room 204 470-3, Turuma Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0004 / JP | 03 /
Horii, Akihiro Room 108 3-4719-5, Soubudai Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0011 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2001/19] | 01 /
Shiraishi, Kenichi Room 407, 475-3, Kariba-cyo, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0025 / JP | ||
02 /
Shinjo, Soichi Room 204, 470-3, Turuma Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0004 / JP | |||
03 /
Horii, Akihiro Room 108, 3-4719-5, Soubudai Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99929762.5 | 08.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999JP03706 | Priority number, date | JP19980218704 | 17.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21870498 | [2001/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0004644 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098444 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098444 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H03M13/00, H04N7/00 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
H04L1/007 (EP,US);
H03M13/15 (EP,US);
H04L1/0052 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4382 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/16] | H03M13/00, H04N7/20, H04N7/64, H04L1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2001/19] | H03M13/00, H04N7/20, H04N7/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/43] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DIGITALER BS-RUNDFUNKEMPFÄNGER | [2001/19] | English: | BS DIGITAL BROADCASTING RECEIVER | [2001/19] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE RADIODIFFUSION NUMERIQUE BS | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2001 | Translation filed | 17.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.03.2017 | FR | 31.07.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/51] | IT | 08.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - PRESS RELEASE, "Plans for the World's First High-Definition Digital Television Broadcasting System by Satellites", MINISTRY OF POST AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS, (19980209), URL: http://www.soumu.go.jp/joho_tsusin/pressrelease/english/broad/news9-9-9.html, XP002368758 [Y] 1,2 * page 4 * * page 6 * | [Y] - SHAYAN Y R ET AL, "A versatile time domain Reed-Solomon decoder", GLOBECOM '89, (19891127), pages 1088 - 1092, XP010083628 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1091, column L, paragraph 2 * | [A] - SALAMI R A ET AL, "Performance of error protected binary pulse excitation coders at 11.4 kb/s over mobile radio channels", ICASSP 90, (19900403), pages 473 - 476, XP010641992 [A] 1,2 * 5. Shortened Reed-Solomon Coding. * | [A] - SALAMI R A ET AL, "A robust transformed binary vector excited coder with embedded error-correction coding", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON SPEECH CODING, (1989), pages 5 - 1, XP006525263 [A] 1,2 * page 4, paragraph 4 * | [A] - KATOH H ET AL, "A FLEXIBLE TRANSMISSION TECHNIQUE FOR THE SATELLITE ISDB SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199609), vol. 42, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 159 - 166, XP000834276 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/11.536575 | International search | [A]JPH07506477 ; | [A]JPH06291746 (SONY CORP) |