EP1094834 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF FUNCTIONAL DYSPEPSIA AND/OR IRRITABLE BOWEL SYNDROME AND NEW USE OF SUBSTANCES THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melacure Therapeutics AB Ullerakersvägen 38 756 43 Uppsala / SE | [2003/35] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hellström, Per Svärdsjövägen 1 167 75 Bromma / SE | ||
For all designated states EFENDIC, Suad Stjärnvägen 16B 181 34 Lindingö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellström, Per Svärdsjövägen 1 167 75 Bromma / SE | 02 /
Efendic, Suad Stjärnvägen 16b 181 34 Lindingö / SE | [2003/35] |
Former [2001/18] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Webber, Philip Michael, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Webber, Philip Michael, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2002/22] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/18] | Fogelberg, Lennart Allied Attorneys Chemical AB, Box 24107 104 51 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99930089.0 | 08.06.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999SE00997 | Priority number, date | SE19980002080 | 11.06.1998 Original published format: SE 9802080 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9964060 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094834 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094834 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26, A61K38/31, A61P1/04 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,US);
A61K38/31 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/31, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/18] | A61K38/26, A61K38/31 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER FUNKTIONALEN DYSPEPSIE UND/ODER DES REIZDARMSYNDROMS UND DIE VERWENDUNG NEUER SUBSTANZEN IN DIESER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/18] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF FUNCTIONAL DYSPEPSIA AND/OR IRRITABLE BOWEL SYNDROME AND NEW USE OF SUBSTANCES THEREIN | [2001/18] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DE TRAITEMENT DE DYSPEPSIE FONCTIONNELLE ET/OU DU SYNDROME DU COLON IRRITABLE ET NOUVELLE UTILISATION DE SUBSTANCES CONTENUES DANS CETTE COMPOSITION | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03024624.3 / EP1405642 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9701579 (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al); | [A]WO9803547 (ONTARIO INC 1149336 [CA], et al) |