EP1005690 - LOW COST FORCE FEEDBACK DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immersion Corporation 50 Rio Robles San Jose CA 95134 / US | [2017/14] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states Immersion Corporation 50 Rio Robles San Jose CA 95134 / US | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Immersion Corporation 30 Rio Robles San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states Immersion Corporation 2158 Paragon Drive San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBERG, Louis, B. 5002 Selter Road San Jose, CA 95132 / US | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Weston, Robert Dale, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [2017/14] |
Former [2010/12] | Weston, Robert Dale, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | ||
Former [2007/46] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/23] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99930559.2 | 22.06.1999 | [2000/23] | WO1999US14085 | Priority number, date | US19980103281 | 23.06.1998 Original published format: US 103281 | US19980156802 | 17.09.1998 Original published format: US 156802 | US19990253132 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: US 253132 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966997 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005690 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005690 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
A63F13/21 (EP);
A63F13/245 (EP);
A63F13/285 (EP);
A63F13/803 (EP);
G06F3/0338 (EP);
G06F3/03543 (EP);
G06F3/03545 (EP);
G06F3/0362 (EP);
A63F2300/1037 (EP);
A63F2300/1062 (EP);
A63F2300/8017 (EP);
G06F2203/013 (EP);
G06F2203/014 (EP);
G06F2203/015 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/28] | G06F3/00 | ||
Former IPC [2000/23] | G09G5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2017/14] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | NIEDRIGKOSTEN-KRAFTRÜCKKOPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2000/23] | English: | LOW COST FORCE FEEDBACK DEVICES | [2000/23] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE RETOUR D'EFFORT A FAIBLE COUT | [2000/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 11.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10181405.1 / EP2273346 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2000 | 21.08.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2000 | 21.08.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2000 | 21.08.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2000 | 21.08.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2000 | 21.08.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2000 | 21.08.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | IE | 22.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | PT | 07.08.2017 | [2018/39] |
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
PT | 07.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
PT | 07.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
PT | 07.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
PT | 07.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
PT | 07.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06102997 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1-24 * abstract *; | [X]JPH06202801 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [X] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9731333 (TOMER SHALIT [SE]) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 17 *; | [A]WO9806024 (IMMERSION HUMAN INTERFACE CORP [US]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 6 * * page 16, line 32 - page 18, line 6 *; | [A]US5734373 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 15 * * column 11, line 34 - column 13, line 55 ** column 29, line 33 - column 32, line 32 * | International search | [Y]US5313230 (VENOLIA DANIEL S [US], et al); | [A]US5589854 (TSAI MING-CHANG [TW]); | [Y]US5643087 (MARCUS BETH A [US], et al); | [A]US5694013 (STEWART PAUL J [US], et al); | [A]US5790108 (SALCUDEAN SEPTIMIU EDMUND [CA], et al) | Examination | JPH07182104 |