EP1093702 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING AUDIO EQUIPMENT IN ACOUSTIC ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acoustic Technologies, Inc. 1921 South Alma School Road Mesa, AZ 85210 / US | [2001/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMASSON, Samuel, L. 1034 East Hearn Gilbert, AZ 85234 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99930810.9 | 29.06.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999US14674 | Priority number, date | US19980109847 | 02.07.1998 Original published format: US 109847 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002420 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093702 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04R29/00, H04H5/00, H04R27/00, H03G5/16 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H04R29/00 (EP,US);
H04S7/301 (EP,US);
H04R29/001 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/17] | H04R29/00, H04H5/00, H04R27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG AUDIOGERÄTES IM AKUSTISCHEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2001/17] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING AUDIO EQUIPMENT IN ACOUSTIC ENVIRONMENTS | [2001/17] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR REGLER UN EQUIPEMENT AUDIO DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS ACOUSTIQUES | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/28] | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2002 | 30.06.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5649019 (THOMASSON SAMUEL L [US]) [DX] 1-3 * abstract * * column 5, lines 56-61 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US5412734 (THOMASSON SAMUEL L [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5694476 (KLIPPEL WOLFGANG [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4628530 (OP DE BEEK FRANCISCUS J [NL], et al); | [A]US4694498 (SUZUKI SHINICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5412734 (THOMASSON SAMUEL L [US]); | [A]US5694476 (KLIPPEL WOLFGANG [US]); | [A]US5768398 (JANSE CORNELIS P [NL], et al); | [AP]US5796847 (KAIHOTSU YUJI [JP], et al); | [A]US5649019 (THOMASSON SAMUEL L [US]); | [AP]US5915029 (YAZURLO DONATO [US], et al); | [A]JPS55112097 (SONY CORP) |