EP1109485 - NON-CONTACT TONOMETER HAVING NON-LINEAR PRESSURE INCREASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems Inc. 3362 Walden Avenue Depew, NY 14043 / US | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCE, David, A. 6034 Goodrich Road Clarence Center, NY 14032 / US | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | Reichert, Werner F., Dr. Leica Microsystems AG, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 99930818.2 | 29.06.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999US14734 | Priority number, date | US19980114698 | 13.07.1998 Original published format: US 114698 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002481 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109485 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/16 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
A61B3/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/26] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSLOSES TONOMETER MIT NICHTLINEARER DRUCKZUNAHME | [2001/26] | English: | NON-CONTACT TONOMETER HAVING NON-LINEAR PRESSURE INCREASE | [2001/26] | French: | TONOMETRE SANS CONTACT A AUGMENTATION DE PRESSION NON LINEAIRE | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 03.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.03.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.04.2001 | 27.03.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   17.04.2001 | 27.03.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.04.2001 | 27.03.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   17.04.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.03.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   17.04.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4996990 (HIDESHIMA MASAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 64; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3 | by applicant | US5779633 | US5279300 |