EP1091896 - APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR RE-ORIENTING AN ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORNDORFF, Jason, Matthew 20544 Alpine Drive Lawrenceburg, IN 47025 / US | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2002/17] | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2001/16] | Kohol, Sonia, et al Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99930859.6 | 02.07.1999 | [2001/16] | WO1999US15013 | Priority number, date | US19980109817 | 02.07.1998 Original published format: US 109817 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001601 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1091896 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/84, B65G29/00 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B65G29/00 (EP);
B65G47/846 (EP);
B65H2301/33216 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/16] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM NEUAUSRICHTEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2001/16] | English: | APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR RE-ORIENTING AN ARTICLE | [2001/16] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES DE REORIENTATION D'OBJETS | [2001/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0787667 (AZIONARIA COSTRUZIONI ACMA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,14,18 * column 1, line 40 - column 1, line 57; figure - *; | [A]US4767487 (TOMSOVIC JR JAMES E [US]) [A] 1,14,18 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 11; figure - *; | [A]EP0439897 (JOA CURT G INC [US]) [A] 1,14,18 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [XA]EP0709317 (BAUMER SRL [IT]) [X] 18 * page 3, column 3, line 22 - page 4, column 5, line 27; figure 2 * [A] 1,14; | [A]DE1931878 (KELLER & CO MASCH C [DE]) [A] 1,14,18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4483351 | US5104116 |