EP1090170 - SPINNER FOR SPINNING A SYNTHETIC THREAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saurer GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2004/16] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states B a r m a g AG Leverkuser Strasse 65 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NITSCHKE, Roland Tückingschulstrasse 23a D-58135 Hagen / DE | 02 /
MEISE, Hansjörg Lerchenweg 51 D-50829 Köln / DE | 03 /
HUTTER, Hans-Gerhard Lohengrinstrasse 24 D-42859 Remscheid / DE | 04 /
ENDERS, Ulrich Schwelmer Strasse 54 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | 05 /
SENGE, Peter Aufenangerstrasse 6 D-44229 Dortmund / DE | 06 /
SCHULZ, Detlev Höhweg 16 D-42477 Radevormwald / DE | 07 /
WIEMER, Dieter Berufsschulstrasse 29 D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/15] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Heilein Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99931100.4 | 17.06.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999EP04225 | Priority number, date | DE1998127518 | 22.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19827518 | DE1998129046 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19829046 | [2001/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9967450 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1090170 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1090170 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/092 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
D01D5/092 (EP,KR,US);
D01D13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/15] | Title | German: | SPINNVORRICHTUNG ZUM SPINNEN EINES SYNTHETISCHEN FADENS | [2001/15] | English: | SPINNER FOR SPINNING A SYNTHETIC THREAD | [2001/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILAGE POUR FILER UN FIL SYNTHETIQUE | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CH678433 (SCHWEIZERISCHE VISCOSE) [X] 17,18,21-26,28 * abstract * * page 3, line 52 - line 55 *; | [X]US5219582 (ANDERSON HARVEY G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,12,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 3 - line 12 * * column 6, line 3 - line 10 *; | [A]EP0613966 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [A] 1,2,6,16 * column 1, line 1 - line 18 ** column 2, line 17 - line 24 * | Examination | WO9515409 |