EP1113854 - FILTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARGO GmbH für Fluidtechnik Industriestrasse 9 76703 Kraichtal-Menzingen / DE | [2001/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASSMANN, Wolfgang Wiesenstrasse 24 D-76703 Kraichtal / DE | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99931258.0 | 07.07.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999EP04768 | Priority number, date | DE1998139190 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19839190 | [2001/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0012195 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113854 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/147 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
B01D35/147 (EP,US);
B01D29/21 (EP,US);
B01D2201/24 (EP,US);
B01D2201/291 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/28] | Title | German: | FILTEREINSATZ | [2001/28] | English: | FILTER ELEMENT | [2001/28] | French: | CARTOUCHE FILTRANTE | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 25.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/24] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19546440 (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-13,15-18 * column 4, line 35 - column 7, line 56 * * column 8, paragraph 2; figures 1-9 * |